Dan-Bunkering (America) Inc. v. Vitol Inc.
Plaintiff: Dan-Bunkering (America) Inc.
Defendant: Vitol Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04677
Filed: November 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Vitol Inc., filed.(Kimmitt, Gerard)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vitol Inc., filed.(Kimmitt, Gerard)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dan-Bunkering (America) Inc., filed.(Manns, Margaret)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dan-Bunkering (America) Inc., filed.(Sparkman, Briton)
November 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 4/9/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
November 29, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vitol Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
November 27, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret L. Manns on behalf of Dan-Bunkering (America) Inc., filed. (Manns, Margaret)
November 27, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Vitol Inc., filed.(Sparkman, Briton)
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vitol Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23660988) filed by Dan-Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sparkman, Briton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan-Bunkering (America) Inc. v. Vitol Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitol Inc.
Represented By: Gerard Joseph Kimmitt, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan-Bunkering (America) Inc.
Represented By: Margaret Lynette Manns
Represented By: Briton Paul Sparkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?