Mendoza-Gomez v. Union Pacific Railroad Individually and Successor-in-Interest to Southern Pacific Transportation Company
Plaintiff: Leopoldo Mendoza-Gomez
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Individually and Successor-in-Interest to Southern Pacific Transportation Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04742
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Union Pacific Railroad Individually and Successor-in-Interest to Southern Pacific Transportation Company, filed.(Studebaker, Jennifer)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Memorandum and Order Regarding Discovery Motions, Motions for Summary Judgment and Analogous Motions to Dismiss.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/15/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Union Pacific Railroad Individually and Successor-in-Interest to Southern Pacific Transportation Company served on 12/5/2019, answer due 2/3/2020, filed.(Winegar, Brian)
December 17, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Leopoldo Mendoza-Gomez, filed.(Winegar, Brian)
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Union Pacific Railroad Individually and Successor-in-Interest to Southern Pacific Transportation Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23706821) filed by Leopoldo Mendoza-Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Winegar, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza-Gomez v. Union Pacific Railroad Individually and Successor-in-Interest to Southern Pacific Transportation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Individually and Successor-in-Interest to Southern Pacific Transportation Company
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Studebaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leopoldo Mendoza-Gomez
Represented By: Brian Broussard Winegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?