Dill v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Dana Dill
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 4:2019cv04755
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Substituting Counsel granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney William Lance Lewis and Rebecca Kendall Yow terminated.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
January 30, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Yow, Rebecca)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Anthony L. Laporte in place of Wm. Lance Lewis by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laporte, Anthony)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot Project.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Defendant's Counterclaim, filed by Dana Dill. (Lane, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED ANSWER to, COUNTERCLAIM against Dana Dill by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, filed. (Yow, Rebecca)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Yow, Rebecca)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-79006. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23714666) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dill v. Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Dill
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Represented By: Anthony Laurent Laporte
Represented By: Matthew Slade Crandall Hansel
Represented By: Kent Melvin Hanszen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Rebecca Kendall Yow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?