Celedon et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Manuel Celedon and Linda Celedon
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 4:2019cv04758
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Substitute Attorney Attorney William Lance Lewis terminated.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney Anthony L. Laporte in place of Wm. Lance Lewis by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Laporte, Anthony)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/11/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
January 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge David Hittner. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (rguerrero, 4)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Linda Celedon, Manuel Celedon, filed.(Lane, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Linda Celedon, Manuel Celedon, filed.(Lane, Robert)
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Linda Celedon, Manuel Celedon by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Lewis, William)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/16/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Carlson, Eric)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 129th Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2019-82948 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23715140) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celedon et al v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Eric G Carlson
Represented By: Anthony Laurent Laporte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: William Lance Lewis
Represented By: Eric G Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Celedon
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Celedon
Represented By: Joshua David Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?