Fhisihazion v. Nielsen
Petitioner: Yemane Fhisihazion
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 4:2019cv04785
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Kirstjen Nielsen, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Robinson-Gaither, Eleanor)
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Yemane Fhisihazion re: #3 Order to Answer; no new address found., filed. (FernandoVilla, 5)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of Service Executed as to United States Attorney Ryan Patrick on 12/18/2019 re: Order to Answer, filed.(CindyMiranda, 5)
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Yemane Fhisihazion re: #2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening, filed. (CindyMiranda, 5)
December 23, 2019 Filing 5 Certified Mail Receipt Returned as to Warden Joe Smith, executed on 12/21/19 re: 4 Document(s) Sent, - receipt attached, access restricted to court users for privacy reasons -, filed. (sguevara, 4)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO ANSWER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (JessicaVillarreal, 3)
December 3, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Yemane Fhisihazion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope)(JessicaVillarreal, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fhisihazion v. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Eleanor A Robinson-Gaither
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yemane Fhisihazion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?