Brooks v. Harris County Jail
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Brooks
Defendant: Harris County Jail
Case Number: 4:2019cv04801
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Confirmation of receipt of payment from TDCJ in the amount of $ 25.00 Receipt date: 1/23/2020. Receipt number HOU093653. Purpose Description: PLRA CIVIL FILING FEE. (GloriaVasquezadi, 4)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/20/2019) (sashabranner, 4).
December 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (agould, 3)
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Donald Ray Brooks, filed. (agould, 3)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Donald Ray Brooks, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/23/2019. (agould, 3)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Harris County Jail (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Donald Ray Brooks.(agould, 3)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Harris County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?