Castro v. Davis
Petitioner: Roxman C Castro
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Case Number: 4:2019cv04933
Filed: December 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for Lorie Davis 3/18/2020.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Lorie Davis, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hanna, Cara)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO ANSWER, ORDER FOR SERVICE ON TX ATTORNEY GENERAL. Filing fee or motion to proceed in forma pauperis due within 30 days; answer due within 60 days. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) (Attachments: #1 Petition) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
December 19, 2019 Filing 3 Specific Referral to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)
December 17, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Roxman C Castro.(BrendaLacy, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roxman C Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Represented By: Cara Blossom Hanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?