Phan v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shandon Phan
Defendant: Summit Trustee Services, LLC and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv04935
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Mandatory Initial Discovery Responses by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Summit Trustee Services, LLC, filed. (Cho, Justin)
February 6, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Summit Trustee Services, LLC, filed.(Cho, Justin)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., Summit Trustee Services, LLC, filed.(Cho, Justin)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 268th District Court of Fort Bend County, Texas, case number 19-DCV-269103 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23803994) filed by Summit Trustee Services, LLC, Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C1 - Plaintiff's Original Petition, #4 Exhibit C2 - Request for Process of Service, #5 Exhibit C3 - Issuance of Citation, #6 Exhibit C4 - TRO, #7 Exhibit C5 - Defendants' Original Answer, #8 Exhibit D - Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit E - List of Counsel of Record)(Cho, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phan v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shandon Phan
Represented By: Shandon Cuong Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Trustee Services, LLC
Represented By: Justin Kyueun Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Kyueun Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?