Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media v. Rangel et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media and Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Defendant: Stella Rangel, Edwin Rangel and Ran & Rod Enterprises, LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv04944
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Innovative Sports Management, Inc., filed.(Lonstein, Julie)
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 REQUEST for Entry of Default against Ran & Rod Enterprises, LLC, Edwin Rangel by Innovative Sports Management, Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of attorney in support of clerks entry, #2 Proposed Order proposed clerk's certificate)(Lonstein, Julie)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant, Stella Rangel, ONLY by Innovative Sports Management, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lonstein, Julie)
January 20, 2020 Filing 8 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ran & Rod Enterprises, LLC served on 1/11/2020, answer due 2/3/2020, filed.(Lonstein, Julie)
January 20, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Edwin Rangel served on 1/11/2020, answer due 2/3/2020, filed.(Lonstein, Julie)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Ran & Rod Enterprises, LLC, Edwin Rangel, Stella Rangel. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(JenniferOlson, 4)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(JenniferOlsonadi, 4)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Serper on behalf of Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, filed. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE Designation of Local Counsel Lauren Serper by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, filed. (Lonstein, Julie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media, filed.(Lonstein, Julie)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ran & Rod Enterprises, LLC, Edwin Rangel, Stella Rangel (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23809479) filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint - Advertisement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplement Summons as to deft Edwin Rangel, #4 Supplement Summons as to deft Ran & Rod Enterprises, LLC, #5 Supplement Summons as to deft Stella Rangel)(Lonstein, Julie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media v. Rangel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stella Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edwin Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ran & Rod Enterprises, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management, Inc.
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?