HDI Global Insurance Company et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company and CG Power Americas LLC
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv04986
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time Initial Conference reset for 4/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ledwards, 4)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Reset Scheduling Conference by HDI Global Insurance Company, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Dana)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by HDI Global Insurance Company, filed.(Martin, Dana)
January 24, 2020 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by HDI Global Insurance Company. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by HDI Global Insurance Company.(Saville, James)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8C before Judge Alfred H Bennett. (Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
December 27, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Union Pacific Railroad Company. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Union Pacific Railroad Company, filed.(Martin, Dana)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23826832) filed by HDI Global Insurance Company.(Martin, Dana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HDI Global Insurance Company et al v. Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HDI Global Insurance Company
Represented By: Dana Keith Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CG Power Americas LLC
Represented By: Dana Keith Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?