Brown v. Davis
Petitioner: Frank Henderson Brown
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Case Number: 4:2019cv05005
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Initial Filing fee: $5.00 re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, receipt number HOU093962, filed. (GloriaVasquez, 4)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to pay the filing fee. Petitioner is ordered to submit a more definite statement of the facts within 30 days of this order.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee by Frank Henderson Brown, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/13/2020. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5) filed by Frank Henderson Brown.(LoriPurifoy, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank Henderson Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lorie Davis
Represented By: Edward Larry Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?