BARCELO v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Plaintiff: NICHOLLE BARCELO
Defendant: TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies Inc and Coopersurgical Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00017
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion for Judgment on The Pleadings by Defendants re: #59 MOTION for Judgment by The Cooper Companies Inc, filed.(De Santos, Laura)
February 21, 2020 Filing 59 MOTION for Judgment by The Cooper Companies Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/13/2020. (De Santos, Laura)
February 19, 2020 Filing 61 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Brian Rubenstein re: #58 Scheduling Order, filed. The address was updated and the Scheduling Order was re-noticed. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4) Modified on 2/25/2020 (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 SCHEDULING AND DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Pltf Expert Witness List and Report due by 8/28/2020. Deft Expert Witness List and Report due by 9/28/2020. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Mediation due by 11/13/2020. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 11/27/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/15/2021. Docket Call set for 1/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Regarding Filing Dates.Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is due by 2/21/2020. Ms. Barcelo Response is by 3/6/2020.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
February 6, 2020 Filing 56 Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Initial conference held on February 6, 2020. The court will separately enter a docketing and scheduling order, and an order setting briefing deadlines, as stated on the record. Appearances: Kara Hill(by phone) for PLtf. and Thomas McIntosh/Frederick Erny(by phone)/ Laura De Santos for Deft.(Court Reporter: K. Miler), filed.(leddins, 4)
February 4, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Kassan, Esq. on behalf of NICHOLLE BARCELO, filed. (Kassan, Randi)
February 3, 2020 Filing 54 Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling and Docket Control Order, filed.(De Santos, Laura)
January 31, 2020 Filing 53 STATUS REPORT by Teva Women's Health, Inc., filed.(De Santos, Laura)
January 31, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference reset for 2/6/2020 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. OTE: Reset it to TIME only. (leddins, 4)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Thomas G McIntosh to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
January 23, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura E. De Santos on behalf of Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies Inc, filed. (De Santos, Laura)
January 21, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION for Thomas G. McIntosh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Coopersurgical Inc, Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/11/2020. (MelissaMorgan, 4)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Fredrick M. Erny to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
January 14, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Frederick M. Erny to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Coopersurgical Inc, Teva Women's Health, Inc., The Cooper Companies Inc, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2020. (sanderson, 4)
January 14, 2020 Filing 46 STATE COURT RECORDS, filed.(EdnitaPonce, 1)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 MOTION for Tobias L. Millrood to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #42 MOTION for Kara D. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(olindor, 4)
January 8, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Tobias L. Millrood to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NICHOLLE BARCELO, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2020. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
January 8, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Kara D. Hill to Appear Pro Hac Vice by NICHOLLE BARCELO, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/29/2020. (LoriPurifoy, 4)
January 6, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. Counsel must file a brief status report and a proposed schedule for the remaining issues by 1/31/20. (leddins, 4)
January 3, 2020 Filing 40 Case transferred in from Pennsylvania Eastern. Case Number 2:18-cv-03984; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
December 30, 2019 Original record transferred to the District of via interdistrict transfer system. Original Record from State will be sent via Certified Mail. (lisad, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF DEFENDANTS TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., COOPERSURGICAL, INC., AND THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. TO TRANSFER THIS ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/2019. 11/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 18, 2019 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/2019. 11/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS TO JOIN TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 11/18/2019.11/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
November 15, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 First MOTION for Joinder of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc Reply in Support of filed by NICHOLLE BARCELO. (HILL, KARA)
November 8, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 First MOTION for Joinder of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(ERNY, FREDERICK)
November 1, 2019 Filing 34 Reply Memorandum in Further Support re #21 MOTION to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC. Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(ERNY, FREDERICK) Modified on 11/4/2019 (lisad, ).
October 25, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by NICHOLLE BARCELO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex.)(HILL, KARA)
October 25, 2019 Filing 32 First MOTION for Joinder of Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc filed by NICHOLLE BARCELO.Teva Pharmaceuticals USA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh.Pkt, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(HILL, KARA)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 9/27/19 IS VACATED. PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL IS GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ANY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE ON OR BEFORE 11/1/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 10/15/19. 10/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #21 MOTION to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. RESPONSES DUE BY 10/25/2019. (va, )
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #27 MOTION TO COMPEL AS DETAILED HEREIN. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE ON OR BEFORE 10/25/2019. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE ANY REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE ON OR BEFORE 11/1/2019. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/27/19. 9/30/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) Modified on 10/16/2019 (mbh, ).(VACATED PER ORDER #31)
September 23, 2019 Filing 29 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Complete Discovery Responses re #27 MOTION to Compel Complete Discovery Responses filed by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E)(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL COMPLETE DISCOVERY RESPONSES ON OR BEFORE 9/23/19. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 9/9/19. 9/10/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, )
September 9, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Compel Complete Discovery Responses filed by NICHOLLE BARCELO.Memorandum, Certificate of Good Faith, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Certificate of Good Faith, #3 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Initial Discovery Requests as to Venue, #4 Exhibit B - Defendants' Initial Discovery Response, #5 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants Deficient Responses, #6 Exhibit D Plaintiffs Joint Letter re: Meet & Confer, #7 Exhibit E - Defendants First Supplemental Response to Discovery)(HILL, KARA)
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III CONFERENCE held on 7/2/19. (jl, )
July 2, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III. A CONFERENCE NOT ON THE RECORD was held on 7/1/19. (fdc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER THAT THE ORDER DATED 5/15/19 #23 IS VACATED. DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' INTERROGATORIES RELATED TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC:1404(A) ON OR BEFORE JULY 12, 2019. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AN SERVE, ON OR BEFORE JULY 31, 2019, ANY RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC:1404(A). DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE AUGUST 12, 2019, ANY REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE. THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINTS OF PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION UNDER RULE 12(B)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER RULE 12(C) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 7/1/19. 7/2/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL SERVE ON OR BEFORE 5/29/19 INTERROGATORIES RELATED TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE. DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE INTERROGATORIES ON OR BEFORE 6/28/19. PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ON OR BEFORE 7/12/19 ANY RESPONSIVE BRIEFS IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO TRANSFER VENUE. DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE ON OR BEFORE 7/22/19 ANY REPLY BRIEFS IN SUPPORT OF THEIR MOTIONS TO TRANSFER VENUE. MOTIONS OF DEFENDANTS TO DISMISS THE COMPLAINTS OF PLAINTIFFS FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION UNDER RULE 12(b)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE AND FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS UNDER RULE 12(c) FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 5/15/19. 5/16/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, ) (ORDER VACATED PURSUANT TO JUDGE BARTLE'S ORDER OF 7/2/19 #24 )Modified 7/2/19 (fdc).
May 15, 2019 Filing 22 Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 5/15/19 before Judge Bartle. (mbh, )
May 13, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Transfer Venue or, in the Alternative, Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction under Rule 12(b)(2) or, in the Alternative, Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN) Modified on 5/14/2019 (lisad, ).
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS SHALL FILE AND SERVE, ON OR BEFORE 5/13/19 AT 12:00 P.M., ANY MOTIONS UNDER 28 U.S.C. &1404 (a), RULE 12 (b)(2) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE, AND RULE 12 (c) OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE. A STATUS CONFERENCE SHALL TAKE PLACE IN CHAMBERS ON 5/15/19 AT 2:00 P.M.; ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 4/22/19. 4/23/19 ENTERED & E-MAILED. (fdc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for Status Conference not on the record was held on 4/22/19, before Judge Harvey Bartle, III. (ti, )
April 1, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 4/22/2019 10:00 AM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III.(km, )
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER THAT DEFENDANTS TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. AND TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC. ARE DISMISSED FROM THE ABOVE ACTIONS AS FRAUDULENTLY JOINED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE, III ON 3/28/2019. 3/28/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas)
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by KARA D. HILL on behalf of NICHOLLE BARCELO with Certificate of Service(HILL, KARA)
October 25, 2018 Filing 15 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ti, )
October 16, 2018 Filing 14 Arbitration Certification that case exceeds the sum of $150,000.00 exclusive of interest and costs (MILLROOD, TOBIAS)
October 15, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN RUBENSTEIN on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(RUBENSTEIN, BRIAN)
October 15, 2018 Filing 12 Remark THE STATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/16/2018 AT 9:30 AM IS CANCELLED. (km, )
October 11, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by TOBIAS MILLROOD on behalf of NICHOLLE BARCELO, Jury Demand, Certificate of Service; Withdrawal of Derek Braslow.(MILLROOD, TOBIAS) Modified on 10/12/2018 (md).
October 10, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by FREDERICK M. ERNY on behalf of COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. with Certificate of Service(ERNY, FREDERICK)
October 5, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/16/2018 09:30 AM IN JUDGE BARTLE'S CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE HARVEY BARTLE III. ADDITIONAL CONFERENCE INFORMATION CONTAINED HEREIN.(km, )
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Amendment to Notice of Removal to Attach Additional State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders (STURGES, GREGORY)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by COOPERSURGICAL, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY)
September 17, 2018 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC..(STURGES, GREGORY)
September 14, 2018 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC.; Corporate Parent TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. for TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC.; Corporate Parent THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. for COOPERSURGICAL, INC. by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC.(ti, )
September 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by COOPERSURGICAL, INC., TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC., TEVA WOMEN'S HEALTH, INC., THE COOPER COMPANIES, INC. from Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, case number June Term, 2018, No. 01127, Certificate of Service. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 184812)(ti, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARCELO v. TEVA PHARMACEUTICALS USA, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEVA BRANDED PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS R&D, INC.
Represented By: GREGORY T. STURGES
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: GREGORY T. STURGES
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Women's Health, Inc.
Represented By: GREGORY T. STURGES
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Represented By: Laura E. De Santos
Represented By: Thomas G McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cooper Companies Inc
Represented By: GREGORY T. STURGES
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Represented By: Laura E. De Santos
Represented By: Thomas G McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coopersurgical Inc
Represented By: GREGORY T. STURGES
Represented By: FREDERICK M. ERNY
Represented By: BRIAN RUBENSTEIN
Represented By: Frederick M Erny
Represented By: Thomas G McIntosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLLE BARCELO
Represented By: TOBIAS MILLROOD
Represented By: DEREK T. BRASLOW
Represented By: KARA D. HILL
Represented By: Randi Alyson Kassan
Represented By: Kara D Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?