Pulse Health Services et al v. FDIC-R et al
Plaintiff: E.W. Johnson and Pulse Health Services
Defendant: FDIC-R and JP Morgan Chase Bank N A
Case Number: 4:2020cv00048
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Original Petition by FDIC-R, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Estes, Dawn)
February 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint and Brief in Support by FDIC-R, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Proposed Order)(Estes, Dawn)
January 27, 2020 Filing 11 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to E.W. Johnson re: #4 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (agould, 3)
January 24, 2020 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Pulse Health Services re: #4 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, filed. (hlerma, 4)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JP Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed.(Hytken, Rachel)
January 22, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FDIC-R, filed.(Estes, Dawn)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by JP Morgan Chase Bank N A, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Hytken, Rachel)
January 17, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to E.W. Johnson re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
January 17, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Pulse Health Services re: #2 Order for Initial Conference - FORM,, filed. (ClaudiaGutierrez, 4)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for FDIC-R 2/13/2020.(Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(rhawkins)
January 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Original Petition by FDIC-R, filed. Motion Docket Date 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Estes, Dawn)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 268th District Court, case number 19-DCV-269350 () filed by FDIC-R. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Supplement List of Attorneys of Record, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Estes, Dawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pulse Health Services et al v. FDIC-R et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FDIC-R
Represented By: Dawn Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase Bank N A
Represented By: Rachel L Hytken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.W. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pulse Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?