Green v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Jerry D. Green
Defendant: Warden Wilkerson, Betty Jo Williams and "Head" Representative For CMHC/TDCJ Physical Therapy
Case Number: 4:2020cv00137
Filed: January 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Alfred H Bennett
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.(Signed by Judge Alfred H Bennett) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
January 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Jerry D. Green, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2020. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jerry D. Green, filed. Motion Docket Date 1/31/2020. (EdnitaPonce, 1)
January 10, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Jerry D. Green.(EdnitaPonce, 1) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/14/2020: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit Grievance Form) (EdnitaPonce, 1).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Wilkerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Jo Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "Head" Representative For CMHC/TDCJ Physical Therapy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry D. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?