Richardson v. NES Global Talent US Inc.
Plaintiff: Jay Richardson
Defendant: NES Global Talent US Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00223
Filed: January 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
September 25, 2020 Filing 65 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
September 18, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
September 11, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting #60 Joint STIPULATION re: Notice to Second Class of Potential Class Members. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 4, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
September 3, 2020 Filing 60 STIPULATION re: Notice to Second Class of Potential Class Members by NES Global Talent US Inc., filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
September 1, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory Canon on behalf of Jay Richardson, filed. (Canon, Cory)
August 27, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
August 21, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
August 13, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
July 28, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consents by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
July 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER advising all counsel of the uncertainty of all jury trials resuming on September 8, 2020, all trial options available as of August 2020, and requesting counsel to advise the court of their choice of trial options. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 23, 2020 Filing 52 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consents by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
July 15, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consents by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
July 10, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consents by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
July 6, 2020 Filing 48 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Mark Rangel by Jay Richardson, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
July 2, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consents by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
June 26, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consents by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
June 19, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consents by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
June 15, 2020 Filing 44 ANSWER to #41 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc. by NES Global Talent US Inc., filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
June 15, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
June 2, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent re: #31 Notice (Other) by Jay Richardson, filed. (Fitz, Carl)
June 1, 2020 Filing 41 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against NES Global Talent US Inc. filed by Jay Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Consent)(Josephson, Michael)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER - Per the parties agreement at the May 19, 2020, hearing, the #25 motion for conditional class certification is granted for two classes. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 19, 2020 Filing 39 Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Motion hearing held on May 19, 2020. The parties discussed conditional class certification. The parties agreed that the court should conditionally certify two classes of NES workers who were allegedly not paid overtime in the past three years: one class of workers who NES classified as exempt from the Fair Labor Standards Act's overtime pay requirements; and another class of employees who NES deemed nonexempt. The parties agreed that the class notice may be sent by both first-class mail and email (and not by other means), with only one reminder notification by either first-class mail or email. The parties agreed to revise the content of the notice as discussed on the record. The court granted Richardson's motion for conditional class certification and court-authorized notice, (Docket Entry No. 25), consistent with the parties' agreement at the hearing. The court also granted Richardson leave to amend the complaint to correctly state NES's company name. The parties may submit proposed amended scheduling orders if necessary.Appearances: Carl Fitz/Michael Josephson/Richard Burch for Pltfs. and Ashlee Grant/Joseph Buller for Defts.(Court Reporter: N. Forrest), filed.(leddins, 4)
May 14, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 5/19/2020 at 03:45 PM by telephone before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. NOTE: The change is to TIME only. Conference call line information will be emailed to counsel. (leddins, 4)
April 29, 2020 Filing 37 SEALED EXHIBITS re: #36 Reply in Support of Motion by Jay Richardson, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Fitz, Carl)
April 29, 2020 Filing 36 REPLY in Support of #25 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by Jay Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Hennigan Pay Records (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B - Adams Pay Records (Filed Under Seal))(Fitz, Carl)
April 25, 2020 Filing 35 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for John Morrison III by Jay Richardson, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting defendant NES Global, LLC's unopposed motion for leave to file documents under seal. Exhibits 1 and 1-A - 1-U to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Certification and Court-Approved Notice #29 shall be filed under seal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 Motion for Extension of Time; Reply to #25 MOTION to Certify Class due by 4/29/2020.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
April 20, 2020 Filing 32 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Conditional Cert by Jay Richardson, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fitz, Carl)
April 17, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE Filing Notice of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
April 15, 2020 Filing 30 Unopposed SEALED EXHIBITS Motion to File Documents Under Seal re: #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, by NES Global Talent US Inc., filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix of Exhibits Filed Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1-A, #4 Exhibit 1-B, #5 Exhibit 1-C, #6 Exhibit 1-D, #7 Exhibit 1-E, #8 Exhibit 1-F, #9 Exhibit 1-G, #10 Exhibit 1-H, #11 Exhibit 1-I, #12 Exhibit 1-J, #13 Exhibit 1-K, #14 Exhibit 1-L, #15 Exhibit 1-M, #16 Exhibit 1-N, #17 Exhibit 1-O, #18 Exhibit 1-P, #19 Exhibit 1-Q, #20 Exhibit 1-R, #21 Exhibit 1-S, #22 Exhibit 1-T, #23 Exhibit 1-U, #24 Proposed Order) (Grant, Ashlee)
April 15, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition to #25 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by NES Global Talent US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 1-A thru 1-U, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Appendix Appendix of Unpublished Authorities, #5 Appendix Tab A, #6 Appendix Tab B, #7 Appendix Tab C, #8 Appendix Tab D, #9 Appendix Tab E, #10 Appendix Tab F, #11 Appendix Tab G)(Grant, Ashlee)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
April 7, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 5/19/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
April 7, 2020 Filing 26 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Agreed Protective Order, filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
March 25, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Certify Class by Jay Richardson, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Richardson Decl, #2 Exhibit Ex 2 - Smith Decl, #3 Exhibit Ex 3 - Walker Decl, #4 Exhibit Ex 4 - Hennigan Decl, #5 Exhibit Ex 5 - Adams Decl, #6 Exhibit Ex 6 - Paystubs, #7 Exhibit Ex 7 - Offer Ltr, #8 Exhibit Ex 8 - Proposed Notice & Consent Form, #9 Exhibit Ex 9 - Proposed Email Script, #10 Exhibit Ex 10 - Proposed Phone Script, #11 Exhibit Ex 11 - Proposed Ntc Timeline, #12 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Fitz, Carl)
March 24, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/17/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. (leddins, 4)
March 20, 2020 Filing 23 PROPOSED ORDER Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling and DOcket Control Order re: #21 JointDiscovery/Case Management Plan, filed.(Fitz, Carl)
March 20, 2020 Filing 22 PROPOSED ORDER Defendant's Proposed Scheduling and Docket Control Order re: #21 JointDiscovery/Case Management Plan, filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
March 20, 2020 Filing 21 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by NES Global Talent US Inc., filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
March 20, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jay Richardson, filed.(Fitz, Carl)
March 11, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Edward Adams by Jay Richardson, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
March 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Consent by Jay Richardson, filed. (Fitz, Carl)
March 6, 2020 Filing 17 JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES re: #14 Stipulation. The Parties stipulate and agree that Defendant will withdraw its affirmative defenses numbered 5 and 11 from its Original Answer to Plaintiff's Original Collective Action Complaint [Dkt. 13], without prejudice to replead these affirmative defenses at a later date.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
March 6, 2020 Filing 16 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Edward Adams by Jay Richardson, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
March 6, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by NES Global Talent US Inc., filed.(Buller, Joseph)
March 5, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION re: Joint Stipulation Regarding Defendant's Affirmative Defenses by NES Global Talent US Inc., filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by NES Global Talent US Inc., filed.(Grant, Ashlee)
February 11, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Daniel Bertrand and Kristoffer Smith by Jay Richardson, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Troy E. Walker by Jay Richardson, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 CONSENT to Join a Collective/Class Action for Michelle Hennigan by Jay Richardson, filed.(Josephson, Michael)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl A. Fitz on behalf of Jay Richardson, filed. (Fitz, Carl)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Jay Richardson, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Josephson on behalf of Jay Richardson, filed. (Josephson, Michael)
January 27, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to NES Global Talent US Inc. served on 1/23/2020, answer due 2/13/2020, filed.(Fitz, Carl)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to NES Global Talent US Inc.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(hlerma, 4)
January 22, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Jay Richardson, filed.(Fitz, Carl)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 4/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Attachments) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
January 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against NES Global Talent US Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-23995038) filed by Jay Richardson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex A)(Fitz, Carl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. NES Global Talent US Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NES Global Talent US Inc.
Represented By: Ashlee Cassman Grant
Represented By: Joseph Richard Buller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Richardson
Represented By: Carl Andrew Fitz
Represented By: Andrew Wells Dunlap
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Represented By: Cory Kenworthy Canon
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?