Lexington Insurance Company et al v. Honda North America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Liberty Surplus Insurance Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Westport Insurance Corporation, Lexington Insurance Company and Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Honda North America, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv00246
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 initial conference is terminated. (arrivera, 4)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER. ETT: 6 Days. Jury Trial: Joinder of Parties due by 10/19/2020, Pltf Expert Witness/reports List due by 11/16/2020. Deft Expert Witness List/Reports due by 1/11/2021. Discovery due by 3/22/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/29/2021. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/21/2021....***Jury Trial set for 6/28/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Axis Surplus Inc. Co., Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Company, Westport Insurance Corporation, filed.(Ramirez, Monica)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, Liberty Surplus Insurance Company, Westport Insurance Corporation, filed.(Ramirez, Monica)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Honda North America, Inc., filed.(Hawkins, Jeffrey)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 03:29 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(RuthGuerreroadi, 4)
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 151st Judicial District Court, Harris County TX, case number 2019-88235 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24005028) filed by Honda North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Errata 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Hawkins, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexington Insurance Company et al v. Honda North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Surplus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Westport Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Endurance American Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda North America, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?