Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. v. Swiber Offshore Mexico et al
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.
Defendant: Swiber Offshore Mexico, Ranger Offshore, In Personam and M/V Swiber ADA In Rem
Case Number: 4:2020cv00321
Filed: January 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 4/23/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Continuance Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 4/15/2020..(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Continuance by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order for Continuance)(Estaba, Anacarolina)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ranger Offshore, In Personam served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020, filed.(Estaba, Anacarolina)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 Notice Regarding Initial Conference(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc., filed.(Estaba, Anacarolina)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ranger Offshore, In Personam. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(rguerrero, 4)
February 7, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ranger Offshore, In Personam, filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Estaba, Anacarolina)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 04:45 PM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(LoriPurifoyadi, 4)
January 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24051442) filed by Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Verification, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Estaba, Anacarolina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc. v. Swiber Offshore Mexico et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Bunkering (America) Inc.
Represented By: Anacarolina Estaba
Represented By: Peter A McLauchlan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiber Offshore Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranger Offshore, In Personam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Swiber ADA In Rem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?