Wilcoxson v. Freedom Dodge et al
Plaintiff: Jasmine Wilcoxson
Defendant: Freedom Dodge, FCA US LLC and Freedom Chrysler Dodge Jeep
Case Number: 4:2020cv00707
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 MOTION to Remand, filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Sonnier, G.)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Freedom Dodge, filed.(Clark, Thomas)
March 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand by Jasmine Wilcoxson, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McAlpine, Kiernan)
March 19, 2020 Filing 9 DESIGNATION of G. Robert Sonnier as attorney in charge of FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jasmine Wilcoxson, filed.(McAlpine, Kiernan)
March 18, 2020 Filing 7 DESIGNATION of Kiernan McAlpine as attorney in charge of Jasmine Wilcoxson, filed.(McAlpine, Kiernan)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 6/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(hcarradi, 4)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333RD District Court, Harris County, case number 2020-02640 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24280864) filed by FCA US LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Sonnier, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilcoxson v. Freedom Dodge et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Dodge
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: G. Robert Sonnier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Chrysler Dodge Jeep
Represented By: Thomas Christopher Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jasmine Wilcoxson
Represented By: Kiernan Angus McAlpine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?