Ricard v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Tara Ricard
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Interested Party: Prudential Financial, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv01197
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2021 Filing 46 REPLY in Support of #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Clabots, Matthew)
November 24, 2021 Filing 45 REPLY to #43 Response to Motion, filed by Tara Ricard. (BrendaLacy, 4)
November 19, 2021 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #41 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Tara Ricard. (JosephWells, 4)
November 16, 2021 Filing 43 RESPONSE to #42 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Clabots, Matthew)
November 1, 2021 Filing 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Tara Ricard, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2021. (MelissaMorgan, 4)
November 1, 2021 Filing 41 MOTION for Summary Judgment by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/22/2021. (Clabots, Matthew)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Denying #33 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 15, 2021 Filing 39 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/15/2021. #30 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. ( Motions for summary judgment filing due by 11/1/2021.). The deadlines in the docket control order are vacated until further notice. Appearances:Tara Ricard, pro se. Ian Hugh Morrison.( Time: 10:43 -10:54)(ERO:YES), filed.(jegonzalez, 4)
September 10, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE to #35 Unopposed MOTION Requesting Status Conference, filed by Tara Ricard. (thanniable, 4)
September 8, 2021 Filing 37 NOTICE of Setting re: #33 MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with deadlines, #30 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 9/15/2021 at 10:30 AM by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (jegonzalez, 4)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35 Unopposed MOTION Requesting Status Conference.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jegonzalez, 4)
September 7, 2021 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION Requesting Status Conference by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clabots, Matthew)
September 3, 2021 Filing 34 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSCRIPT/RECORD by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of D. Nese (AR JPMorgan Chase plan documents), #2 Declaration of A. Hoffer (AR claim file), #3 Declaration of K. Petrone (AR Prudential contracts), #4 1of3 Claim File - Ricard, Tara - 12411524, #5 2of3 Claim File - Ricard, Tara - 12411524, #6 3of3 Claim File - Ricard, Tara - 12411524, #7 2. G-50684-DE, #8 3. AMD, G-50684-DE, 06-01-2017, 15, #9 4. 50684, LTD, TACC between 60K and 200K, Ed 06-2017, 11, #10 5. JPMC Wrap Plan (2015), #11 6. JPMC Plan Admin (2014), #12 7. JPMC Long Term Disability (2014), #13 8. 2016 JPMC Benefits Year End Bulletin, #14 9. 2017 JPM Benefits Year End Bulletin, #15 10. 2019 JPMC SPD, #16 11. 2019 Plan Admin SPD)(Clabots, Matthew)
September 3, 2021 Filing 33 MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with deadlines by Tara Ricard, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2021. (ckrus, 4)
August 10, 2021 Filing 32 RESPONSE to #31 Response to Motion, filed by Tara Ricard. (MelissaMorgan, 4)
August 9, 2021 Filing 31 RESPONSE to #30 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clabots, Matthew)
August 5, 2021 Filing 30 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Tara Ricard, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/26/2021. (JosephWells, 4)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #28 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
July 2, 2021 Filing 28 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to Retain Counsel by Tara Ricard, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/23/2021. (sguevara, 4)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
June 3, 2021 Filing 26 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time Comply with Deadlines by Tara Ricard, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(BrendaLacy, 4)
May 6, 2021 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C Hanks, Jr. At the hearing, the following rulings were made as stated on the record:The Court held a motion hearing as stated on the record. This case is ADMINISTRATIVELY REOPENED. The Court GRANTS the motion to withdraw filed by Plaintiffs counsel, Britney McDonald. [Dkt. 19] Ms. McDonald will provide Plaintiff with a complete copy of her case file by May 14, 2021. Plaintiff will obtain new counsel by June 7, 2021. The Court will move the trial of this case to the September/October 2021 trial term. Appearances: Britney Anne Heath McDonald, Ian Hugh Morrison, Matthew A. Clabots.(ERO:yes), filed.(gkelner, 4)
April 30, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Resetting re: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Britney McDonald to Withdraw as Attorney. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 5/6/2021 at 09:15 AM in by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. Plaintiff must be present at the hearing. (gclairadi, 4)
April 30, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Reset Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Tara Ricard, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Reschule Hearing)(McDonald, Britney Anne)
April 30, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of Resetting re: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Britney McDonald to Withdraw as Attorney. Parties notified. Motion Hearing reset for 5/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. Plaintiff must be present at the hearing (gclairadi, 4)
April 22, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Setting re: #19 Unopposed MOTION for Britney McDonald to Withdraw as Attorney. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2021 at 10:00 AM in by video before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. Plaintiff must be present at the hearing. (gclairadi, 4)
March 22, 2021 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #19 Unopposed MOTION for Britney McDonald to Withdraw as Attorney filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Clabots, Matthew)
March 18, 2021 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Britney McDonald to Withdraw as Attorney by Tara Ricard, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McDonald, Britney Anne)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
February 8, 2021 Filing 17 PROPOSED ORDER re: #16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Stipulation of Dismissal, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne)
February 8, 2021 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time File Stipulation of Dismissal by Tara Ricard, filed. Motion Docket Date 3/1/2021. (McDonald, Britney Anne)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting #14 Notice of Settlement. Case terminated on 12/10/2020. Deadline to reinstate: within 60 days from the date of this order. Deadline to reinstate: February 8, 2021(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
December 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed. (Clabots, Matthew)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 8/28/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 8/28/2020 Pltf Expert Witness List due by 11/20/2020. Pltf Expert Report due by 11/20/2020. Deft Expert Witness List due by 12/18/2020. Deft Expert Report due by 12/18/2020. Discovery due by 1/22/2021. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/5/2021. All Other Pretrial Motions due by 4/9/2021. Joint Pretrial Order and Motions in Limine due by 5/28/2021. Docket Call set for 6/4/2021 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Judge George C Hanks Jr.,ETT: 2 Days. Bench. Case is subject to being called to trial on short notice during the months of July/August 2021.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(ltrevino, 3)
August 13, 2020 Minute entry for proceedings before Magistrate Judge Andrew M. Edison. Initial conference held on August 13, 2020. The court and parties conferred and the court set out a schedule for the case. The scheduling order will be entered separately. Appearances: Britney Anne Heath McDonald and Matthew A. Clabots. (Court Reporter: L. Wells), filed. (wbostic, 4)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed.(Clabots, Matthew)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Joint Discovery/Case Management Plan due by 8/6/2020.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Matthew A. Clabots to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(SusanGram, 3)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Matthew A. Clabots to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Tara Ricard, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/26/2020.
May 4, 2020 ***Set/Reset Deadlines as to #9 MOTION for Matthew A, Clabots to Appear Pro Hac Vice : Non-Dispositive Motion Filing due by 5/26/2020. (JessieHutchinson, 2)
April 30, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed.(Morrison, Ian)
April 30, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed.(Morrison, Ian)
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ian H. Morrison on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed. (Morrison, Ian)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(DawnWaggoner, 4)
April 3, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Tara Ricard, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne)
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America, filed.(McDonald, Britney Anne)
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24510849) filed by Tara Ricard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDonald, Britney Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ricard v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Ian Hugh Morrison
Represented By: Matthew A. Clabots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Ricard
Represented By: Britney Anne Heath McDonald
Represented By: Matthew A. Clabots
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Prudential Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?