Couchman et al v. Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Toby P. Couchman and Kristine M. Couchman
Defendant: Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC and Federal National Mortgage Association
Case Number: 4:2020cv01240
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order Resetting Conference. Initial Conference reset for 6/26/2020 at 02:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Extension ORDER. By 6/20/2020, Pingora Loan Servicing and Federal National Mortgage Association may answer or otherwise respond #9 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Amended Complaint by Federal National Mortgage Association, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cabrera, Marc)
May 6, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Federal National Mortgage Association, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC filed by Toby P. Couchman, Kristine M. Couchman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1- DOT, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2- Satisfaction Survey, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3- Settle Loc House, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4- Unsigned FMV)(Lane, Robert)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss #5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Kristine M. Couchman, Toby P. Couchman, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Settle Loc House, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Unsigned FMV, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Satisfaction Survey, #4 Proposed Order ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS)(Lane, Robert)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order: Initial Conference set for 6/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Federal National Mortgage Association, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(Cabrera, Marc)
April 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal National Mortgage Association, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC, filed.(Cabrera, Marc)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Federal National Mortgage Association, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC, filed.(Cabrera, Marc)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th Judicial District Court, Harris Co. TX, case number 2020-13683 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24525407) filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit D-4, #9 Exhibit D-5, #10 Exhibit E)(Cabrera, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Couchman et al v. Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pingora Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Marc Daniel Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Marc Daniel Cabrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toby P. Couchman
Represented By: Scott Alexander Lick
Represented By: Joshua D. Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristine M. Couchman
Represented By: Scott Alexander Lick
Represented By: Joshua D. Gordon
Represented By: Robert Chamless Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?