Vazquez Barrera et al v. Wolf et al
Petitioner: Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, Chenghui Gao, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Phillip Bakasa and Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez
Respondent: Matthew Albence, Randy Tate, Chad Wolf, Patrick Contreras and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Amicus Curiae: Kathryn Hampton, Joseph Brick, Brie Williams and Joe Goldenson
Case Number: 4:2020cv01241
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION to Dismiss #44 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, as to all claims except Bakasa's individual claim under 8 U.S.C. 1231 by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa)
June 5, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Setting as to #88 MOTION to Compel Production of Ex Parte Filing. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 6/8/2020 at 03:30 PM in by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
June 4, 2020 Filing 90 REPLY in Support of #88 MOTION to Compel Production of Ex Parte Filing, filed by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera. (Segura, Andre)
June 3, 2020 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition to #88 MOTION to Compel Production of Ex Parte Filing, filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa)
June 2, 2020 Filing 88 MOTION to Compel Production of Ex Parte Filing by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Segura, Andre)
June 1, 2020 Filing 87 SEALED EX PARTE DOCUMENT by U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, filed. (rwestmoreland, 4)
June 1, 2020 Filing 86 Supplemental RESPONSE to #79 Memorandum and Order , filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 30, 2020 Filing 85 REPLY in Support of #45 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera. (Segura, Andre)
May 29, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sanchez v. Brown (N.D. Tex.), #2 Exhibit Provines v. Wilson (N.D. Tex.), #3 Exhibit Tendo v. Rodriguez (S.D. Tex.))(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 29, 2020 Filing 83 RESPONSE to #77 Notice (Other), #80 Notice (Other) , filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 28, 2020 Filing 82 RESPONSE to #79 Memorandum and Order , filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Terry Manuel)(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 28, 2020 Filing 81 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Defendants for Transcript of MOTION HEARING held on 5/21/2020 Judge Keith Ellison. 3-Day turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Mayra Malone, filed. (Cravens, Annalisa)
May 26, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Segura, Andre)
May 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Responses due by 5/28/2020.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
May 23, 2020 Filing 78 SUPPLEMENT to #51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #52 Opposed MOTION to Strike #44 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, #45 MOTION to Certify Class by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed.(Hu, Daniel)
May 22, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Segura, Andre)
May 21, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 5/21/2020. Argument heard on #45 Motion for Class Certification, #51 Motion to Dismiss, #52 Motion to Strike, #55 Motion for Expedited Discovery, #57 Motion for Expedited Relief. Motions taken under advisement. Appearances: Annalisa L. Cravens, Daniel David Hu, Christopher D Pineda, Andre Ivan Segura, Erin Marie Choi, Noor Zafar, Rochelle Mercedes Garza, Eunice Cho, Bernardo Rafael Cruz, Vera Eidelman, Kathryn Huddleston, Lauren Kuhlik, Michael Tan.(Court Reporter: M. Malone)(Law Clerk: J. Zhang), filed.(arrivera, 4)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4)
May 21, 2020 Filing 75 SEALED REPLY Petitioners-Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Their Motion for Expedited Bail Hearings re: #65 Response in Opposition to Motion by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit) (Segura, Andre)
May 20, 2020 Filing 74 SEALED EXHIBITS Exhibit 14 re: #73 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Excerpt of Escobar Milano Medical Records) (Cravens, Annalisa)
May 20, 2020 Filing 73 RESPONSE in Opposition to #45 MOTION to Certify Class, filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Terry Manuel, ICE ERO, #2 Exhibit List of Pro Bono Legal Services Providers, #3 Exhibit CDC - People Who Are At Higher Risk for COVID-19, #4 Exhibit CDC - Mitigation Strategies - March 2020, #5 Exhibit CDC - Mitigation Strategies - May 2020, #6 Exhibit COVID-19 and Epilepsy, #7 Exhibit Patients in China with Hypertension, #8 Exhibit Int'l Society of Hypertension, #9 Exhibit American Heart Ass'n, #10 Exhibit American Journal of Hypertension, #11 Exhibit Skrarupski re Aging Prison Population, #12 Exhibit Garg re Hospitalization Rates, #13 Exhibit Nat'l Kidney Foundation, #14 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 20, 2020 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Segura, Andre)
May 20, 2020 Filing 71 REPLY in Support of #51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Pineda, Christopher)
May 20, 2020 Filing 70 RESPONSE to #68 Objections, to 57 MOTION to Expedite Relief (Defendants' Evidentiary Objections), filed by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera. (Genender, Paul)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages. IS ORDERED that Defendants #64 response in opposition to Plaintiffs motion for expedited bail hearings is accepted into the record. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
May 18, 2020 Filing 68 OBJECTIONS to #57 MOTION to Expedite Relief (Defendants' Evidentiary Objections), filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pineda, Christopher)
May 18, 2020 Filing 67 Additional EXHIBITS re: #64 Sealed Response, #65 Response in Opposition to Motion by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. Attached documents may be viewed in the Office of the Clerk., filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 66 SEALED EXHIBITS 1 through 11 and 17 through 20 re: #64 Sealed Response, #65 Response in Opposition to Motion by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Affidavit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Affidavit Exhibit 17, #13 Affidavit Exhibit 18, #14 Affidavit Exhibit 19, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 20) (Cravens, Annalisa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 65 RESPONSE in Opposition to #57 MOTION to Expedite Relief, filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 64 SEALED RESPONSE re: #57 MOTION to Expedite Relief by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cravens, Annalisa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 18, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Setting as to #57 MOTION to Expedite Relief, #54 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Discovery, #51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #52 Opposed MOTION to Strike #44 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, #45 MOTION to Certify Class . Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 5/21/2020 at 02:30 PM in by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
May 15, 2020 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition to #51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, #52 Opposed MOTION to Strike #44 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, #45 MOTION to Certify Class , filed by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera. (Genender, Paul)
May 13, 2020 Filing 60 STIPULATION re: Motion Response Deadlines by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed.(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 7, 2020 Filing 59 REPLY in Support of #54 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Discovery, filed by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera. (Segura, Andre)
May 5, 2020 Filing 58 NOTICE of Appearance by Edgar Saldivar on behalf of Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Saldivar, Edgar)
May 4, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Expedite Relief by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum ISO Motion to Expedite Relief, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order ISO Motion to Expedite Relief)(Segura, Andre)
May 4, 2020 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition to #54 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Discovery, filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 1, 2020 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM In Support re: #54 MOTION to Expedite Discovery MOTION for Discovery by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed.(Segura, Andre)
May 1, 2020 Filing 54 MOTION to Expedite Discovery, MOTION for Discovery( Motion Docket Date 5/22/2020.) by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Segura, Andre)
May 1, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Segura, Andre)
May 1, 2020 Filing 52 Opposed MOTION to Strike #44 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc.,, #45 MOTION to Certify Class by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa)
May 1, 2020 Filing 51 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa)
April 30, 2020 Filing 50 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Lauren Kuhlik re: #35 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. No new address found., filed. (Attachments: #1 Cover) (CodyArnold, 5)
April 30, 2020 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of #45 MOTION to Certify Class by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, filed.(Genender, Paul)
April 30, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE of Certificate of Conference re: #45 MOTION to Certify Class by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Segura, Andre)
April 30, 2020 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Pineda on behalf of Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Pineda, Christopher)
April 30, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel D. Hu on behalf of Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Hu, Daniel)
April 29, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION to Certify Class by Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Chenghui Gao, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Supplemental Declaration of Attorney Holly Kuchera, #3 B Declaration of Andre I. Segura, #4 Proposed Order)(Genender, Paul)
April 29, 2020 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Matthew Albence, Joseph Brick, Patrick Contreras, Joe Goldenson, Kathryn Hampton, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Brie Williams, Chad Wolf filed by Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Bassam Jebril, Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano, Phillip Bakasa, Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez, Chenghui Gao. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Homer Venters Suppl. Declaration, #3 Exhibit Joseph J. Amon Suppl. Decl, #4 Exhibit Dora Schriro Decl., #5 Exhibit Yaneysi Diaz Ramirez Decl., #6 Exhibit Chenghui Gao Decl., #7 Exhibit Phillip Bakasa Decl., #8 Exhibit Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano Decl., #9 Exhibit Phillip Bakasa Suppl. Decl.)(Segura, Andre)
April 28, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Segura, Andre)
April 28, 2020 ***Delivery Confirmation re: 42 Document(s) Sent,, filed. (hlerma, 4)
April 23, 2020 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to attorney Bernardo Rafael Cruz as to Roman Vazquez Barrera re: #20 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #17 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #19 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #15 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #18 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #16 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #21 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed. (dmorales, 5)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(arrivera, 4)
April 16, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Segura, Andre)
April 16, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Omar Jadwat on behalf of Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Segura, Andre)
April 16, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE Regarding Receipt of Mr. Jebril's Medical Records by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Cravens, Annalisa)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #30 Motion for David Kimball-Stanley to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Darren W. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Susanna Buergel to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Public Health and Human Rights Experts.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
April 15, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE to #31 Response to Defendants' Supplement, filed by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas. (Segura, Andre)
April 15, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Rochelle Garza on behalf of Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Garza, Rochelle)
April 14, 2020 Filing 31 Supplemental RESPONSE , filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Cravens, Annalisa)
April 14, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for David Kimball-Stanley to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Brick, Joe Goldenson, Kathryn Hampton, Brie Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2020. (Turkevich, Paul)
April 14, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Darren W. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Brick, Joe Goldenson, Kathryn Hampton, Brie Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2020. (Turkevich, Paul)
April 14, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION for Susanna Buergel to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph Brick, Joe Goldenson, Kathryn Hampton, Brie Williams, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2020. (Turkevich, Paul)
April 14, 2020 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae Public Health & Human Rights Experts by Joseph Brick, Brie Williams, Joe Goldenson, Kathryn Hampton, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Turkevich, Paul)
April 14, 2020 Filing 26 SEALED RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief [Dkt. 24] by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Cravens, Annalisa)
April 14, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief [Dkt. 24], filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Cravens, Annalisa)
April 13, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 4/13/2020. Motion taken under advisement. Appearances:Daniel Hu, Paul Genender, Erin Choi. Annalisa L. Cravens, Paul Stevens Turkevich, Noor Zafar, Andre Ivan Segura, Rochelle Mercedes Garza, Eunice Cho, Vera Eidelman, David Fathi, Kathryn Huddleston, Michael Tan.(Court Reporter: J. Sanchez)(Law Clerk: J. Zhang), filed.(arrivera, 4)
April 13, 2020 Filing 24 Supplemental REPLY to Response to #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera. (Segura, Andre)
April 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Service by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. (Segura, Andre)
April 13, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition to #12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Par Alvarado Order Granting Bond, #2 Exhibit Rojas Notice to Appear, #3 Exhibit Rojas Misdemeanor Pleas, #4 Exhibit Rojas USCIS Notice, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Dr. Uchenna Orazulike, #6 Exhibit Jebril Order of Removal, #7 Exhibit Jebril Criminal Complaint for Assault of Family Member Impeding Breathing, #8 Exhibit Jebril Judgment of Conviction for Assault of Family Member, #9 Exhibit Jebril Order of Protection, #10 Exhibit Jebril Criminal Complaint for Violation of Condition of Bond, #11 Exhibit Jebril Immigration Court decision denying cancellation of removal, #12 Exhibit Jebril Judgment of Conviction for Violation of Protective Order, #13 Exhibit Jebril Felony Indictment for Aggravated Sexual Assault, #14 Exhibit Jebril Order scheduling 4-17-2020 setting in aggravated sexual assault case, #15 Exhibit Jebril BIA decision dismissing appeal, dated 3-17-2020, #16 Affidavit Declaration of Deportation Officer Angel Bracero, #17 Exhibit ICE Guidance re: Custody Review, dated 4-4-2020, #18 Exhibit N.Z.M. v. Wolf, #19 Affidavit Declaration of Annalisa L. Cravens, #20 Proposed Order)(Cravens, Annalisa)
April 11, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, filed. (Segura, Andre)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Noor Zafar to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Michael Tan to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Lauren Kuhlik to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Kathryn Huddleston to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #8 Motion for David Fathi to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Vera Eidelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Bernardo Rafael Cruz to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Eunice Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum In Support of Temporary Restraining Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Julia Montiel, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Maria Vazquez, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Holly Kuchera, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Abeer Wadi, #7 Proposed Order)(Segura, Andre)
April 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Noor Zafar to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Segura, Andre)
April 10, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Michael Tan to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Segura, Andre)
April 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Lauren Kuhlik to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Segura, Andre)
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for David Fathi to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Segura, Andre)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Vera Eidelman to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Segura, Andre)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Eunice Cho to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Segura, Andre)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Kathryn Huddleston to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Segura, Andre)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Bernardo Rafael Cruz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bassam Jebril, Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Roman Vazquez Barrera, filed. Motion Docket Date 5/1/2020. (Segura, Andre)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Annalisa L. Cravens on behalf of Matthew Albence, Patrick Contreras, Randy Tate, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Chad Wolf, filed. (Cravens, Annalisa)
April 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Telephone Conference set for 4/13/2020 at 02:00 PM by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0541-24525589) filed by Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, Georgina Rojas, Bassam Jebril, Roman Vazquez Barrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jonathan Golob, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph Amon, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Georgina Rojas, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Roman Vazquez Barrera, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Bassam Jebril, #6 Exhibit Declaration of Katharina Obser, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Homer Venters, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Luis Antonio Par Alvarado, #9 Exhibit Declaration of Federico Lopez Santiago, #10 Exhibit Declaration of Cindy Edith Ramirez, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Segura, Andre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vazquez Barrera et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bassam Jebril
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Bernardo Rafael Cruz
Represented By: Paul Richard Genender
Represented By: Michael Tan
Represented By: Noor Zafar
Represented By: Rochelle Mercedes Garza
Represented By: Lauren Kuhlik
Represented By: Kathryn Huddleston
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: David Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Luis Antonio Par Alvarado
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Bernardo Rafael Cruz
Represented By: Paul Richard Genender
Represented By: Michael Tan
Represented By: Noor Zafar
Represented By: Rochelle Mercedes Garza
Represented By: Lauren Kuhlik
Represented By: Kathryn Huddleston
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: David Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Georgina Rojas
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Bernardo Rafael Cruz
Represented By: Paul Richard Genender
Represented By: Michael Tan
Represented By: Noor Zafar
Represented By: Rochelle Mercedes Garza
Represented By: Lauren Kuhlik
Represented By: Kathryn Huddleston
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: David Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roman Vazquez Barrera
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Bernardo Rafael Cruz
Represented By: Paul Richard Genender
Represented By: Michael Tan
Represented By: Noor Zafar
Represented By: Rochelle Mercedes Garza
Represented By: Lauren Kuhlik
Represented By: Kathryn Huddleston
Represented By: Vera Eidelman
Represented By: Eunice Cho
Represented By: David Fathi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chenghui Gao
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Ronald L. Miller
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Paul Richard Genender
Represented By: Erin Marie Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maria Eugenia Escobar Milano
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Ronald L. Miller
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Paul Richard Genender
Represented By: Erin Marie Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Phillip Bakasa
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Ronald L. Miller
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Paul Richard Genender
Represented By: Erin Marie Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yaneysi Diaz- Ramirez
Represented By: Andre Ivan Segura
Represented By: Ronald L. Miller
Represented By: Edgar Saldivar
Represented By: Paul Richard Genender
Represented By: Erin Marie Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Albence
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Randy Tate
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Contreras
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Annalisa L. Cravens
Represented By: Christopher D Pineda
Represented By: Daniel David Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Kathryn Hampton
Represented By: Susanna Buergel
Represented By: David Kimball-Stanley
Represented By: Paul Stevens Turkevich
Represented By: Darren W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joseph Brick
Represented By: Susanna Buergel
Represented By: David Kimball-Stanley
Represented By: Paul Stevens Turkevich
Represented By: Darren W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Brie Williams
Represented By: Susanna Buergel
Represented By: David Kimball-Stanley
Represented By: Paul Stevens Turkevich
Represented By: Darren W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Joe Goldenson
Represented By: Susanna Buergel
Represented By: David Kimball-Stanley
Represented By: Paul Stevens Turkevich
Represented By: Darren W Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?