Bondyopadhyay et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Plaintiff: Probir K. Bondyopadhyay and Madhuri Bondyopadhyay
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, As Trustee and The Bank of New York Mellon
Case Number: 4:2020cv01340
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Summers, Monica)
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Madhuri Bondyopadhyay, Probir K. Bondyopadhyay, filed.(sguevara, 4)
May 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Affidavit of Beneficiary Owner by Madhuri Bondyopadhyay and Probir K. Bondyopadhyay, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(JessieHutchinson, 2)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 BRIEF re: #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Madhuri Bondyopadhyay, Probir K. Bondyopadhyay, filed.(sguevara, 4)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File Letter written by defendant's attorney Summers by Madhuri Bondyopadhyay, Probir K. Bondyopadhyay, filed. Motion Docket Date 6/5/2020. (rguerrero, 4)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 State Court Petition/Notice of Removal by Madhuri Bondyopadhyay, Probir K. Bondyopadhyay, filed.(sguevara, 4)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - The Bank of New York Mellon has indicated that it would like to consolidate this case with a case currently before Judge Hughes, Bondyopadhyay, et al. v. Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, 4:20-cv-1359 (S.D. Tex. Apr. 16, 2020). Because of the apparent similarities between the two cases, the court finds that transfer and coordination is appropriate. The court will address whether consolidation is appropriate at a later time. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by The Bank of New York Mellon, filed.(McInnis, Walter)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ClaudiaGutierrezadi, 4)
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Bank of New York Mellon, As Trustee, filed.(Summers, Monica)
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 61st District Court; Harris County, case number 2019-68895 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24553049) filed by The Bank of New York Mellon, As Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs' original petition, #3 Exhibit 2 - Plaintiffs' correspondence, #4 Exhibit 3 - Citations/returns, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiffs' proposed order, #6 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiffs' additional defendant included in the case, #7 Exhibit 6 - Plaintiffs' motion for judicial determination of essential facts to resolve the case, #8 Exhibit 7 - Plaintiffs' motion for judicial determination of ownership of this fraudulent financial instrument defendants, #9 Exhibit 8 - Plaintiffs' motion for including of a new defendant, #10 Exhibit 9 - Notice of intent to dismiss, #11 Exhibit 10 - BoNYM's answer, #12 Exhibit 11 - State court docket sheet, #13 Exhibit 12 - Civil cover sheet, #14 Exhibit 13 - List of attorneys, #15 Exhibit 14 - Harris county appraisal district real property account information)(McInnis, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bondyopadhyay et al v. The Bank of New York Mellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Probir K. Bondyopadhyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madhuri Bondyopadhyay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon, As Trustee
Represented By: Monica Lizette Summers
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Monica Lizette Summers
Represented By: Walter Lewis Edmond McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?