Henry v. Applewhite et al
Plaintiff: Johnathon B.K. Henry
Defendant: H. Ortiz, Alicia A Coss, Daniel D Dickerson, John Doe, Captian Carlos A Applewhite, Major Bobby D Rigsby, Assistant Warden Tracy Hutto and Lakita L William
Case Number: 4:2020cv02085
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 12 Letter from Johnathon B.K. Henry re: 1/22/2020 Hearing, filed. (ShoshanaArnow, 4)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Johnathon B. K. Henry, filed. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit A and B Medical Records, #3 Exhibit)(JacquelineMata, 4) Modified on 7/28/2020 (JacquelineMata, 4).
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Authenticated Records. Notice sent to parties as ordered. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Johnathon B.K. Henry re: #8 MOTION for More Definite Statement, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(BeverlyWright, 4)
July 7, 2020 Filing 8 More Definite Statement by Johnathon B.K. Henry, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/28/2020. (hlerma, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2020: #1 Exhibit A, #2 cover letter, #3 envelope) (jdav, 4). Text modified on 7/13/2020 (ghassan, 4).
June 29, 2020 *** Copy of #6 Order Granting IFP sent by regular mail to TDCJ-Off of Gen Counsel and Inmate Trust Fund, filed. (sanderson, 4)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT as to Johnathon B.K. Henry. More Definite Statement due by 7/24/2020. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Pauper Status as to Johnathon B.K. Henry. Henry may proceed as a pauper #2 . (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Johnathon B.K. Henry, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Johnathan Henry re: Inmate Trust Fund, filed. (dnoriega, 1)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
June 12, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Johnathon B.K. Henry, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/6/2020. (jdav, 4)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Johnathon B.K. Henry #1 cover letter, #2 exhibits, #3 Exhibits, #4 envelope) (jdav, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Applewhite et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia A Coss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel D Dickerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Captian Carlos A Applewhite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Bobby D Rigsby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assistant Warden Tracy Hutto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakita L William
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathon B.K. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?