DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH et al v. Hunting Titan, Inc.
Plaintiff: DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH and DynaEnergetics US, Inc.
Defendant: Hunting Titan, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02123
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Office: Houston Office
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/14/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(mmapps, 4)
June 17, 2020 Filing 42 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 6:20-cv-00069; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion to Transfer Case. Hunting Titans motion for transfer venue to Southern District of Texas is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
May 26, 2020 Filing 40 Plaintiffs DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH and DynaEnergetics US, Inc.s ANSWER to #36 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, And Affirmative Defenses by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc..(Findlay, Eric)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SCHEDULING ORDER: Markman Hearing set for 10/15/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Joinder of Parties due by 11/27/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2021. Motions due by 7/22/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 9/3/2021 before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 10/14/2021 before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (am)
May 13, 2020 Filing 38 Proposed Scheduling Order (Agreed) by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Findlay, Eric)
May 13, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT HUNTING TITAN, INC.'S INOPERATIVE FIRST AMENDED ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIMS to #35 Amended Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
May 12, 2020 Filing 36 Defendant's ANSWER to #32 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Saunders, Jason)
April 29, 2020 Filing 35 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' First #20 Amended Complaint, Affirmatiive Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Saunders, Jason)
April 29, 2020 Filing 34 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., re #26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss AND STRIKE DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FOR UNENFORCEABILITY DUE TO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT filed by Plaintiff DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, Plaintiff DynaEnergetics US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Findlay, Eric)
April 29, 2020 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Alan D Albright: Scheduling Conference held on 4/29/2020. Case called for telephonic scheduling conference. Parties have agreed to a Markman Hearing date/time of October 15, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. for 1/2 day in Austin. The parties can anticipate that they will receive the preliminary claims construction the day before the Markman Hearing from the Court. The Court has Markman Hearing tutorials on-line as samples. The Court would like the tutorials before the Markman Hearing. At the end of the Markman Hearing the discovery stay will be lifted and the date for the jury trial will be set. (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.) (Court Reporter Kristie Davis.)(lad)
April 28, 2020 Filing 32 AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hunting Titan, Inc. amending, filed by DynaEnergetics US, Inc., DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Findlay, Eric)
April 28, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Hunting Titan, Inc., re #25 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Hunting Titan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Saunders, Jason)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RESETTING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE for 4/29/2020 10:15 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
April 24, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Artoush Ohanian on behalf of Hunting Titan, Inc. . Attorney Henry Artoush Ohanian added to party Hunting Titan, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Henry Artoush Ohanian added to party Hunting Titan, Inc. (pty:cc), Attorney Henry Artoush Ohanian added to party Hunting Titan, Inc. (pty:cc) (Ohanian, Henry)
April 22, 2020 Filing 28 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Hunting Titan, Inc., re #26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss AND STRIKE DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FOR UNENFORCEABILITY DUE TO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT filed by Plaintiff DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, Plaintiff DynaEnergetics US, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Saunders, Jason)
April 21, 2020 Filing 27 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc., re #25 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Hunting Titan, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G)(Findlay, Eric)
April 8, 2020 Filing 26 Opposed MOTION to Dismiss AND STRIKE DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE FOR UNENFORCEABILITY DUE TO INEQUITABLE CONDUCT by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E)(Findlay, Eric)
April 7, 2020 Filing 25 Opposed MOTION to Transfer Case by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Proposed Order Transfer Venue)(Saunders, Jason)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS PATENT CASE: Telephonic Rule 16 Case Management Conference set for 4/29/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Telephone Conference set for 4/29/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5)
April 6, 2020 Filing 22 Defendant's ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Saunders, Jason)
March 24, 2020 Filing 21 STANDING ORDER from U.S. District Judge Alan D. Albright regarding scheduled civil hearings. (tada)
March 23, 2020 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Hunting Titan, Inc. amending #1 Complaint,., filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Patent No. 10,429,161, #2 Exhibit B - US Patent No. 10,472,938, #3 Exhibit C - '161 Claim Chart, #4 Exhibit D - '938 Claim Chart)(Findlay, Eric)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
March 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF READINESS FOR SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
March 17, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher P. McKeon for Jason A. Saunders ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13354513) by on behalf of Hunting Titan, Inc.. (McKeon, Christopher)
March 17, 2020 Filing 17 Certificate of Interested Parties by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (McKeon, Christopher)
March 17, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc. by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(McKeon, Christopher)
February 21, 2020 Reset Deadlines: Hunting Titan, Inc. answer due 3/17/2020. (lad)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendant's Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including March 17, 2020 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 20, 2020 Filing 15 Pro Hac Vice Letter for Hunting Titan, Inc.. (am)
February 20, 2020 Filing 14 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Complaint by Hunting Titan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKeon, Christopher)
February 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hunting Titan, Inc. answer due 2/20/2020.
February 3, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 ***To be refiled with correct Summons and correct event*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. Hunting Titan, Inc. served on 1/31/2020, answer due 3/31/2020. (Findlay, Eric) Modified on 2/3/2020 (am).
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Text Order GRANTING #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Before the Court is the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy)
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric H. Findlay filed on behalf of Preston H. Heard ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13151711) by on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric H. Findlay filed on behalf of Lisa J. Moyles ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13151680) by on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric H. Findlay filed on behalf of Jason M. Rockman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13151668) by on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
January 31, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric H. Findlay filed on behalf of Julie C. Giardina ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13151650) by on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric H. Findlay filed on behalf of Barry J. Herman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13151632) by on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric H. Findlay filed on behalf of Ana J. Friedman ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-13151593) by on behalf of DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Findlay, Eric)
January 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hunting Titan, Inc.. (am)
January 30, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am)
January 30, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Findlay, Eric)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. to Hunting Titan, Inc. (Findlay, Eric)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13144987), filed by DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH, DynaEnergetics US, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Findlay, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH et al v. Hunting Titan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DynaEnergetics Europe GmbH
Represented By: Barry Jeff Herman
Represented By: Jason M. Rockman
Represented By: Ana J. Friedman
Represented By: Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric H Findlay
Represented By: Lisa J. Moyles
Represented By: Julie C Giardina
Represented By: Preston H Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DynaEnergetics US, Inc.
Represented By: Barry Jeff Herman
Represented By: Jason M. Rockman
Represented By: Ana J. Friedman
Represented By: Brian Craft
Represented By: Eric H Findlay
Represented By: Lisa J. Moyles
Represented By: Julie C Giardina
Represented By: Preston H Heard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunting Titan, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Paul McKeon
Represented By: Henry Artoush Ohanian
Represented By: Jason Allan Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?