Allen v. Wilmington Trust National Association
Plaintiff: Julius Allen
Defendant: Wilmington Trust National Association, As Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1 and Wilmington Trust National Association
Case Number: 4:2020cv02165
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MISCELLANEOUS HEARING held on 7/30/2020 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for TRO #8 is DENIED. Appearances: Kerry Lee Prisock, Crystal G Gibson.(Court Reporter: L. Smith)(Law Clerk: K. Schiffman), filed.(arrivera, 4)
July 30, 2020 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION( Motion Docket Date 8/20/2020.), MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Julius Allen, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Julius Allen, #2 Proposed Order Temporary Restraining Order)(Vilt, Robert)
July 30, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Miscellaneous Hearing set for 7/30/2020 at 04:15 PM at by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. Execution of the writ of possession should be paused until the hearing. (arrivera, 4)
June 23, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Keith P Ellison. MOTION HEARING held on 6/23/2020 on Defendants Motion to Lift Stay #3 . The parties agreed to seek a resolution to the motion outside of court proceedings. Appearances: Robert Clayton Vilt, Kerry Lee Prisock, Shelley L. Hopkins.(Court Reporter: L. Smith)(Law Clerk: K. Schiffman), filed.(arrivera, 4) Modified on 7/6/2020 (arrivera, 4).
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shelley L. Hopkins on behalf of Wilmington Trust National Association, filed. (Hopkins, Shelley)
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Setting as to #3 MOTION to Lift Stay. Parties notified. Motion Hearing set for 6/23/2020 at 11:00 AM in by telephone before Judge Keith P Ellison, filed. (arrivera, 4)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
June 19, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Lift Stay by Wilmington Trust National Association, As Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Crystal)
June 19, 2020 Filing 2 COUNTERCLAIM against Julius Allen filed by Wilmington Trust National Association, As Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-STD, #2 Exhibit B-2018 Petition, #3 Exhibit C-Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, #4 Exhibit D-FED appeal judgment, #5 Exhibit E- 2nd Lawsuit POP, #6 Exhibit F- Rule 11 Agreement, #7 Exhibit G- BK Order May 4 2020)(Gibson, Crystal)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 334th District Court of Harris Co., case number 2020-34384 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24820687) filed by Wilmington Trust National Association, As Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Index of the Matters, #2 Exhibit 2- State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 3-List of All Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4-Notice of removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet 5-Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6-Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Int Parties, #7 Exhibit 7-Harris Co. CAD)(Gibson, Crystal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Wilmington Trust National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius Allen
Represented By: Robert Clayton Vilt
Represented By: Kerry Lee Prisock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust National Association, As Trustee for MFRA Trust 2015-1
Represented By: Crystal G Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilmington Trust National Association
Represented By: Crystal G Gibson
Represented By: Shelley L. Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?