Veltmann et al v. Ballard
Plaintiff: Aziel Corp. and Clyde Veltmann
Defendant: John Ballard
Case Number: 4:2020cv02179
Filed: June 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Sim Lake
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY in Support of #3 Opposed MOTION to Stay the Litigation, filed by John Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Olsky, David)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion for William S. Echols to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference (Initial Conference set for 9/25/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake.) (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
July 23, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Continuance of Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by John Ballard, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Olsky, David)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE to #3 Opposed MOTION to Stay the Litigation, filed by Clyde Veltmann. (mmapps, 4)
July 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for William S Echols to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Aziel Corp., Clyde Veltmann, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/10/2020. (mmapps, 4)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by John Ballard, filed.(Olsky, David)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by John Ballard, filed.(Olsky, David)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by John Ballard, filed.(Deason, Dax)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #2 Motion for David F. Olsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/24/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. (Signed by Judge Sim Lake) Parties notified. (aboyd, 4)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Opposed MOTION to Stay the Litigation by John Ballard, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of John Ballard, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Deason, Dax)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for David F. Olsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John Ballard, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/15/2020. (Deason, Dax)
June 19, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 270th District Court of Harris County, case number 202030427 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24824835) filed by John Ballard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Matters Being Filed, #2 Exhibit Service and Petition, #3 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court)(Deason, Dax)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veltmann et al v. Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aziel Corp.
Represented By: William S. Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clyde Veltmann
Represented By: William S. Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ballard
Represented By: Dax Brian Deason
Represented By: David F. Olsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?