In Re The Complaint and Petition of Callan Marine, LTD.
Petitioner: Callan Marine, LTD.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02224
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Andrew S Hanen
Referring Judge: Frances H Stacy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Callan Marine, LTD., filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. This case is TRANSFERRED to US Magistrate Judge Frances H. Stacy for all pretrial matters to include the issuance of a Memorandum and Recommendation on any dispositive motions. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 CLAIM filed by Arturo Benavidez.(Buzbee, Anthony)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Arturo Benavidez, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Arturo Benavidez, Anthony Buzbee, filed.(Buzbee, Anthony)
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Callan Marine, LTD., filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 704 before Magistrate Judge Frances H Stacy. (Signed by Judge Andrew S Hanen) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 PROPOSED ORDER for Ad Interim Stipulation for Value re: #1 Complaint, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED ORDER Directing Claimants to File and Make Proof of Claim, Directing the Issuance of Notice, and Restraining Prosecution of Claims re: #1 Complaint, filed.(Noe Wilson, Susan)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Callan Marine, Ltd. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0541-24840614). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Robert P. Vining, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Monition, #7 Notice of Action, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Noe Wilson, Susan) Payment information added on 6/24/2020 (ltien, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re The Complaint and Petition of Callan Marine, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Callan Marine, LTD.
Represented By: Susan D Noe Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?