Sullivan et al v. Feldman et al
Plaintiff: CERBERUS INSURANCE CORP., St. Charles Holdings, L.L.C., Center for Breast Restorative Surgery, L.L.C., Frank Dellacroce, Scott Sullivan, SIGMA DELTA BILLING, LLC, JANUS INSURANCE CORP., St. Charles Surgical Hospital, L.L.C. and ORION INSURANCE CORP.
Defendant: Jeff Carlson, Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, Stewart A Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP, CAPSTONE INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, LTD. and Capstone Associated Services, Ltd.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02236
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 The Initial Pretrial Scheduling Conference set for 8/27/20 is terminated based on the stay enetered. (leddins, 4)
August 14, 2020 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION entered GRANTING #27 Opposed MOTION for Clarification as to #26 Memorandum and Opinion,,Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration.(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 13, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Center for Breast Restorative Surgery, L.L.C., Cerberus Insurance Corp., Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corp., Orion Insurance Corp., Sigma Delta Billing, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, L.L.C., St. Charles Surgical Hospital, L.L.C., Scott Sullivan, filed.(McDowell, John)
August 11, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript as to #28 Transcript. Party notified, filed. (olindor, 4)
August 10, 2020 Filing 28 TRANSCRIPT re: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2020 before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. Court Reporter/Transcriber K. Metzger. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2020., filed. (kmetzger)
August 10, 2020 Filing 27 Opposed MOTION for Clarification as to #26 Memorandum and Opinion,,, Opposed MOTION for Reconsideration ( Motion Docket Date 8/31/2020.) by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, Capstone Associated Services, Ltd., Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd., Jeff Carlson, Stewart A Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Gorman, Edward)
August 3, 2020 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION - Granting #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Expedited) ; Denying #10 Cross MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Doc. 2), ; Denying #12 MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceeding Pending Before Hon. Grant Dorfman of Conflict Resolution Services, PLLC, Denying #13 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Stay Arbitration Proceeding Pending Before Hon. Grant Dorfman of Conflict Resolution Services, PLLC. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
August 2, 2020 Filing 25 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Plaintiffs/James Garner for Transcript of Motions to Compel Arbitration on July 24, 2020 before Judge Rosenthal. Expedited (7 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy Metzger, filed. (Garner, James)
July 30, 2020 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, Capstone Associated Services, Ltd., Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd., Jeff Carlson, Stewart A Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Gorman, Edward)
July 28, 2020 Filing 22 AO 435 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by The Feldman Law Firm/Joseph F. Greenberg for Transcript of Motions to Compel Arbitration on July 24, 2020 before Judge Rosenthal. Ordinary (30 days) turnaround requested. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy Metzger, filed. (Greenberg, Joseph)
July 24, 2020 Filing 23 Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Motion hearing held on July 24, 2020. The court heard argument on the parties motions, and will issue an opinion soon. Appearances: Andy Paredes, James Garner, Kacy Joy Shindler, Joseph Greenberg, Edward Gorman and David Freedman.(Court Reporter: K Metzger), filed.(leddins, 4)
July 23, 2020 Filing 21 Second SUPPLEMENT to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, Capstone Associated Services, Ltd., Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd., Stewart A Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Gorman, Edward)
July 23, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY in Support of #12 MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceeding Pending Before Hon. Grant Dorfman of Conflict Resolution Services, PLLC, filed by Scott Sullivan, et al. (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 4, #5 5, #6 6, #7 7, #8 8, #9 9, #10 10)(Garner, James) (per counsel) Modified on 7/23/2020 (MarcelleLaBee).
July 21, 2020 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT to #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, #18 Notice (Other), #17 Exhibits, by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, Capstone Associated Services, Ltd., Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd., Stewart A Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Envelope 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Gorman, Edward)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Joinder in Filing with: re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, #17 Exhibits, by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, Capstone Associated Services, Ltd., Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd., Jeff Carlson, filed. (Paredes, L)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 Supplemental EXHIBITS re: #16 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Stewart A Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Gorman, Edward)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition to #10 Cross MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Doc. 2), #12 MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceeding Pending Before Hon. Grant Dorfman of Conflict Resolution Services, PLLC, filed by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, Capstone Associated Services, Ltd., Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd., Jeff Carlson, Stewart A Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP. (Gorman, Edward)
July 16, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter L. Hilbert, Jr., Thomas J. Madigan, II, Jeffrey D. Kessler, and David A. Freedman on behalf of Center for Breast Restorative Surgery, L.L.C., Cerberus Insurance Corp., Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corp., Orion Insurance Corp., Sigma Delta Billing, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, L.L.C., St. Charles Surgical Hospital, L.L.C., Scott Sullivan, filed. (Garner, James)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. The court has received the plaintiffs motion to expedite consideration of the motion to stay arbitration proceedings. #13 . The defendants must submit their response brief to the plaintiffs cross-motion to compel, #10 , and motion to stay, #12 , by July 20, 2020 at 5 P.M. The court will hear argument on the cross-motions to compel and the motion to stay at a hearing on Zoom set for July 24, 2020, at 4 P.M. Participant instructions will be separately circulated. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(rguerrero, 4)
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Expedite Consideration of Motion to Stay Arbitration Proceeding Pending Before Hon. Grant Dorfman of Conflict Resolution Services, PLLC [DOC 12] by Center for Breast Restorative Surgery, L.L.C., Cerberus Insurance Corp., Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corp., Orion Insurance Corp., Sigma Delta Billing, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, L.L.C., St. Charles Surgical Hospital, L.L.C., Scott Sullivan, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garner, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Arbitration Proceeding Pending Before Hon. Grant Dorfman of Conflict Resolution Services, PLLC by Center for Breast Restorative Surgery, L.L.C., Cerberus Insurance Corp., Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corp., Orion Insurance Corp., Sigma Delta Billing, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, L.L.C., St. Charles Surgical Hospital, L.L.C., Scott Sullivan, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Order)(Garner, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT to #5 Notice (Other), #9 Supplement, #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Expedited) by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, Capstone Associated Services, Ltd., Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd., Jeff Carlson, filed.(Paredes, L)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 Cross MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Doc. 2) by Center for Breast Restorative Surgery, L.L.C., Cerberus Insurance Corp., Frank Dellacroce, Janus Insurance Corp., Orion Insurance Corp., Sigma Delta Billing, LLC, St. Charles Holdings, L.L.C., St. Charles Surgical Hospital, L.L.C., Scott Sullivan, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Garner, James)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT to #4 Notice (Other), #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Expedited) by Stewart A Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed.(Gorman, Edward)
July 3, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Expedited Motion to Compel and Staying Other Proceedings re: #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Expedited), filed.(Paredes, L)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 Corrected SEALED EXHIBITS re: #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Expedited) by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Motion to Compel Arb) (Paredes, L)
June 26, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Expedited) by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jeff Carlson)(Paredes, L)
June 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Removal and Joinder in Expedited Motion to Compel Arbitration re: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Expedited) by Capstone Associated Services, Ltd., Capstone Insurance Management, Ltd., Jeff Carlson, filed. (Paredes, L)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Consent to Removal and Joinder in Expedited Motion to Compel Arbitration re: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Expedited) by Stewart A Feldman, The Feldman Law Firm LLP, filed. (Feldman, Stewart)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 10:15 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (Expedited) by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1, #2 Exhibit Ex 2, #3 Exhibit Ex 3, #4 Exhibit Ex 4, #5 Exhibit Ex 5, #6 Exhibit Ex 6, #7 Exhibit Ex 7)(Paredes, L)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 189th District Court, case number 2020-36407 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24845169) filed by Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A State Court pleadings)(Paredes, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sullivan et al v. Feldman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CERBERUS INSURANCE CORP.
Represented By: Kacy Joy Shindler
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: John Thomas McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Charles Holdings, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kacy Joy Shindler
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: John Thomas McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Breast Restorative Surgery, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kacy Joy Shindler
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: John Thomas McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Dellacroce
Represented By: Kacy Joy Shindler
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: John Thomas McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Sullivan
Represented By: Kacy Joy Shindler
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: John Thomas McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SIGMA DELTA BILLING, LLC
Represented By: Kacy Joy Shindler
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: John Thomas McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANUS INSURANCE CORP.
Represented By: Kacy Joy Shindler
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: John Thomas McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Charles Surgical Hospital, L.L.C.
Represented By: Kacy Joy Shindler
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: John Thomas McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORION INSURANCE CORP.
Represented By: Kacy Joy Shindler
Represented By: James M Garner
Represented By: John Thomas McDowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Carlson
Represented By: L Andy Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Associated Services (Wyoming), Limited Partnership
Represented By: L Andy Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stewart A Feldman
Represented By: Edward John Gorman
Represented By: Joseph F Greenberg
Represented By: Stewart A Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Feldman Law Firm LLP
Represented By: Edward John Gorman
Represented By: Joseph F Greenberg
Represented By: Stewart A Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAPSTONE INSURANCE MANAGEMENT, LTD.
Represented By: L Andy Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capstone Associated Services, Ltd.
Represented By: L Andy Paredes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?