Davis v. Galagaza et al
Plaintiff: Erik Davis
Defendant: Don Davis, The Sekumade Law Firm, Walter Davis, Jackson Lewis L.L.P., Joseph Galagaza, John Sekumade, Jackson Lewis P.C. and Protect Controls Incorporated
Case Number: 4:2020cv02349
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1104
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT Erik Davis, filed(hlerma, 4)
August 19, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #19 Document, #18 Certificate of Conference by Erik Davis, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mmapps, 4)
August 19, 2020 Filing 19 Request for Issuance of Summons by Erik Davis, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 18, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: Plaintiff's Second Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs Second Opposed Motion for Service of Summons, by Erik Davis, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 18, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #12 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Second Opposed Motion for Service of Summons by Erik Davis, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Peter Bray for full pretrial management.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER re: #12 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Second Opposed Motion for Service of Summons, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Service of Summons)(JenniferOlson, 4)
August 14, 2020 Filing 16 Plaintiffs Original Petition by Erik Davis, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray re #12 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Second Opposed Motion for Service of Summons, filed. (ealexander, 4)
August 10, 2020 Filing 12 Plaintiffs Second MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs Second Opposed Motion for Service of Summons by Erik Davis, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/31/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Motion)(JenniferLongoria, 1)
August 10, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Erik Davis, filed.(JenniferLongoria, 1)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray re #8 MOTION for Leave to File to File a Notice, filed. (ealexander, 4)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Leave to File.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Referral of Motion to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray re #4 MOTION for Leave to File Opposed Motion for Service of Summons, filed. (ealexander, 4)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to File to File a Notice of Constitutional Question by Erik Davis, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 notice, #2 Proposed Order)(sguevara, 4)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Erik Davis, filed.#1 Envelope (jdav, 4)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Erik Davis, filed.(jdav, 4)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to File Opposed Motion for Service of Summons by Erik Davis, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order/motion for leave, #2 Opposed Motion for Service of Summons, #3 Proposed Order / Opposed Motion for service of summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(jdav, 4)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (MelissaMorgan, 4)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(MelissaMorganadi, 4)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Erik Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MelissaMorgan, 4) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2020: #2 Exhibit) (MelissaMorgan, 4). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2020: #3 Request for Summons) (MelissaMorgan, 4).
July 2, 2020 Summons Not Issued as to Joseph Galagaza(as Administrator), Jackson Lewis L.L.P., Jackson Lewis P.C. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by First-class mail, filed. Only one summons received for multiple defendants.(MelissaMorgan, 4)
July 2, 2020 Civil Filing fee: $400 re: #1 Complaint,, receipt number HOU096317, filed. (BrendaLacy, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Galagaza et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sekumade Law Firm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Lewis L.L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Galagaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Sekumade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Lewis P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Protect Controls Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?