Miles et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: James Miles and Kimberly A Miles
Defendant: JK/SK FCA US LLC and FCA US LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv02479
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 8 Agreed PROPOSED ORDER RE SCHEDULING re: #4 Order for Initial Conference,, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Germer Beaman & Brown PLLC, counsel for FCA US LLC, filed. (Sonnier, G.)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 9/17/2020 at 09:45 AM in by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by FCA US LLC, filed.(Sonnier, G.)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FCA US LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.Plaintiffs Original Petition, #2 Exhibit B.Defendant FCA US LLCs Original Answer, #3 Exhibit C.State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Exhibit D.Citation and Return of Service re FCA US LLC, #5 Exhibit E.FCA US LLCs Jury Demand, #6 Exhibit F.Notice to State Court of Removal, #7 Exhibit G. List of Counsel of Record, #8 Exhibit H Index of Documents, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sonnier, G.): 0541-24928026 Modified on 7/15/2020 (mmapps, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miles et al v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Miles
Represented By: Nickolas Anthony Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly A Miles
Represented By: Nickolas Anthony Spencer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JK/SK FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: G. Robert Sonnier
Represented By: Ian Matthew Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?