Lozoya v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Plaintiff: Gloria Lozoya
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv02513
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Partial Motion Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramirez, John)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED PETITION against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC filed by Gloria Lozoya.(Hinojosa, Richard)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Partial Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Hoffman, Neal)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
July 27, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Gloria Lozoya, filed. (Hinojosa, Richard)
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Initial Disclosure by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Hoffman, Neal)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Neal A. Hoffman on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Hoffman, Neal)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 152nd District Court, Harris County, case number 2020-33401 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24935428) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit Original Answer (State Court), #5 Exhibit Jury Demand (State Court))(Ramirez, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lozoya v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC
Represented By: John A. Ramirez
Represented By: Neal Alexander Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gloria Lozoya
Represented By: Richard A. Hinojosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?