Moore v. SGT 2000, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald Moore
Defendant: SGT 2000, Inc. and St. David's Georgetown Hospital
Case Number: 4:2020cv02514
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Keith P Ellison
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand by Donald Moore, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Proposed Order)(Bentley, Dennis)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Donald Moore, filed.(Bentley, Dennis)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/16/2020 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Certificate of Notice of Removal by SGT 2000, Inc., filed.(Marshall, Jeffrey)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 55th Judicial District Court Harris County, case number 202024446-7 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24935436) filed by SGT 2000, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Index of Documents, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Marshall, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. SGT 2000, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Moore
Represented By: Dennis James Bentley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGT 2000, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Osmon Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. David's Georgetown Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?