FIEL Houston et al v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Orlando Saenz, Enrique Contreras, Elizabeth Rebolloso, Anahi Lagunas, FIEL Houston, Maria Gutierrez, Cesar Espinosa, Shayli Rodriguez and Fernando Miranda Marin
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 4:2020cv02515
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Response to Defendants Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Enrique Contreras, Cesar Espinosa, FIEL Houston, Maria Gutierrez, Anahi Lagunas, Fernando Miranda Marin, Elizabeth Rebolloso, Shayli Rodriguez, Orlando Saenz, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gonzalez, Raed)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Proposed Order)(Thorp, Galen)
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss #4 Amended Complaint/Counterclaim/Crossclaim etc., by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/25/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thorp, Galen)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Galen N. Thorp to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) (Attachments: #1 DC reg) Parties notified.(jdav, 4)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Galen N. Thorp to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2020. (Pezzi, Stephen)
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pezzi, Stephen)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is due on or before 9/4/2020. ORDERED that the deadline for Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification is suspended pending further order of the Court; and further ORDERED that, within 14 days after the Court has ruled on both Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Defendants Motion to Dismiss, the Parties shall meet and confer and submit a proposed schedule for briefing Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
August 17, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time (Deadlines for Defs.' Opp'ns to Pls.' Mot. for Preliminary Injunction & Mot. for Class-Certification) by Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pezzi, Stephen)
August 17, 2020 Filing 16 Joint REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Pezzi, Stephen)
August 14, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST for pre-motion conference, filed.(Pezzi, Stephen)
August 14, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen M. Pezzi on behalf of Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Chad F. Wolf, filed. (Pezzi, Stephen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enrique Contreras, Cesar Espinosa, FIEL Houston, Maria Gutierrez, Anahi Lagunas, Fernando Miranda Marin, Elizabeth Rebolloso, Shayli Rodriguez, Orlando Saenz, filed.(Gonzalez, Raed)
July 31, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Certify Class by Enrique Contreras, Cesar Espinosa, FIEL Houston, Maria Gutierrez, Anahi Lagunas, Fernando Miranda Marin, Elizabeth Rebolloso, Shayli Rodriguez, Orlando Saenz, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Gonzalez, Raed)
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Enrique Contreras, Cesar Espinosa, FIEL Houston, Maria Gutierrez, Anahi Lagunas, Fernando Miranda Marin, Elizabeth Rebolloso, Shayli Rodriguez, Orlando Saenz, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Gonzalez, Raed)
July 28, 2020 Filing 10 RETURN of Service Executed as to Ryan K. Patrick on 07/27/2020 re: Complaint, Amended Complaint, Exhibits, Procedures, Initial Conference, Summons, filed.(Gonzalez, Raed)
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Gonzalez, Raed)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jdavadi, 4)
July 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. Judge Nancy F Atlas no longer assigned to the case. Parties notified, filed. (jdav, 4)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RECUSAL ORDER. Judge Nancy F Atlas recused. Deadlines in scheduling orders subsist. Court settings are vacated.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Fernando Miranda Marin, Cesar Espinosa, FIEL Houston, Orlando Saenz, Anahi Lagunas, Shayli Rodriguez, Maria Gutierrez, Elizabeth Rebolloso, Enrique Contreras. Related document: #1 Complaint, filed by Orlando Saenz, Anahi Lagunas, Fernando Miranda Marin, Enrique Contreras, FIEL Houston, Elizabeth Rebolloso, Maria Gutierrez, Shayli Rodriguez, Cesar Espinosa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-4)(Gonzalez, Raed)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, Attorney General of the United States William P. Barr; U.S. Attorney Ryan K. Patrick, filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation Summons 2, #2 Continuation Summons 3, #3 Continuation Summons 4)(Gonzalez, Raed)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24935776) filed by Fernando Miranda Marin, Cesar Espinosa, FIEL Houston, Orlando Saenz, Anahi Lagunas, Shayli Rodriguez, Maria Gutierrez, Elizabeth Rebolloso, Enrique Contreras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4)(Gonzalez, Raed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FIEL Houston et al v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orlando Saenz
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Contreras
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Rebolloso
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anahi Lagunas
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FIEL Houston
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gutierrez
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cesar Espinosa
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayli Rodriguez
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Miranda Marin
Represented By: Raed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T. Cuccinelli
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Represented By: Galen N Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Stephen Michael Pezzi
Represented By: Galen N Thorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?