Morales v. Evanston Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alvaro Morales d/b/a Alvaro Construction and Alvaro Morales doing business as Alvaro Construction
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2020cv02519
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Evanston Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen)
August 21, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Evanston Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference by Telephone and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Counsel who filed or removed the action is responsible for placing the conference call and insuring that all parties are on the line. The call shall be placed to (713)250-5613. Telephone Conference set for 12/17/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M Hoyt.(Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(chorace)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 First AMENDED ANSWER to by Evanston Insurance Company, filed. (Melendi, Stephen)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint by Evanston Insurance Company, filed.(Melendi, Stephen)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 270th Judicial District, Harris County, case number 2020-35028 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24937041) filed by Evanston Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4)(Melendi, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morales v. Evanston Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Morales d/b/a Alvaro Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvaro Morales doing business as Alvaro Construction
Represented By: Karalynn Candace Cromeens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephen A Melendi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?