Montemayor v. Olin Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sergio A Montemayor
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company and Olin Corporation
Case Number: 4:2020cv02533
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REMAND granting #5 Joint MOTION to Remand. This case is remanded to the 239th Judicial District Court of Brazoria County, Texas. Case terminated on 08/12/2020.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Remand by Olin Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Joint Agreed Motion for Remand)(Neff, Sabrina)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Olin Corporation's deadline to answer or otherwise appear is extended to 08/17/2020.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Answer by Olin Corporation, filed. Motion Docket Date 8/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Neff, Sabrina)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/2/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brazoria District Court, case number 108309-CV (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24942579) filed by Olin Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Neff, Sabrina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montemayor v. Olin Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dow Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olin Corporation
Represented By: Sabrina Anne Neff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio A Montemayor
Represented By: Robert Thomas Rice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?