Gallardo v. Ward
Plaintiff: Maria G Gallardo
Defendant: Haley Elizabeth Ward
Case Number: 4:2020cv02535
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing and Service of Controverting Affidavit by Haley Elizabeth Ward, filed. (Oubre, David)
August 18, 2020 Filing 6 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Haley Elizabeth Ward, filed.(Oubre, David)
August 12, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Conference by Meemic Insurance Company, filed.(Oubre, David)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Joint CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Maria G Gallardo, filed.(Goff, Jason)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKETED IN ERROR CLERKS NOTICE of Filing Fee Due. Parties notified, filed. (klove, 4) Modified on 7/29/2020 (klove, 4).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Maria G Gallardo filed by Haley Elizabeth Ward. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Oubre, David)(0541-24942728) Modified on 7/20/2020 (mmapps, 4).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallardo v. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley Elizabeth Ward
Represented By: David Alan Oubre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria G Gallardo
Represented By: Jason D Goff
Represented By: Lupe Pena
Represented By: Javier Marcos, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?