Wesolek v. Pacific Hunt Energy Corp
Plaintiff: Robert C Wesolek
Defendant: Pacific Hunt Energy Corp
Case Number: 4:2020cv02537
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Peter Bray
Referring Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY in Support of #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp. (Sheeder, Robert)
September 10, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw #10 MOTION for Extension of Time File a Reply MOTION to Strike #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sheeder, Robert)
September 9, 2020 Filing 10 EMAIL MOTION for Extension of Time File a Reply( Motion Docket Date 9/30/2020.), MOTION to Strike #8 Response in Opposition to Motion, #9 Response in Opposition to Motion Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp, filed. (jmarchand, 4)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 Amended RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Robert C Wesolek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order On Plaintiff's Response to Defendants Motion to Partial Dismiss)(Bernstein, Craig)
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Robert C Wesolek. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order on Pacific Hunt Energy Corporations Partial Motion to Dismiss)(Bernstein, Craig)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motions referred to Peter Bray. by Pacific Hunt Energy Corp, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Attachment A, #2 Proposed Order)(Sheeder, Robert)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray(Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified.(jmarchand, 4)
July 24, 2020 Filing 5 General Reference to Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. The initial conference set for 10/5/2020 before Judge Lynn N. Hughes is cancelled. (ghassan, 4)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE. Initial Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 03:30 PM in Room 11122 before Judge Lynn N Hughes (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed.(Frederiksen, Charles)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24943006) filed by Robert C Wesolek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-L)(Frederiksen, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesolek v. Pacific Hunt Energy Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Hunt Energy Corp
Represented By: Robert E Sheeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert C Wesolek
Represented By: Charles Christian Frederiksen, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?