Rodriguez v. Saul
Plaintiff: Eliazar E Rodriguez
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 4:2020cv02563
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Filing 3 RETURN of Service Executed as to Ryan Patrick, US Attorney on 8/6/2020 re: Complaint and Summons, filed.(jdav, 4)
July 22, 2020 Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General, filed. Copy of Complaint, copy of IFP Order, issued Summons and USM 285 forwarded to USM for service. (jdav, 4)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement)(Andrews, James)
July 22, 2020 Summons Not Issued as to Andrew Saul as no proposed summons provided. Attorney for Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(jdav, 4)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul filed by Eliazar E Rodriguez. (Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis granted 7/17/2020 by the Honorable Andrew S. Hanen)(jdav, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliazar E Rodriguez
Represented By: James Foster Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?