True Wireless, Inc. v. HTH Communications, LLC
Plaintiff: True Wireless, Inc.
Defendant: HTH Communications, LLC
Case Number: 4:2020cv02666
Filed: July 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File. Deadline to file an answer or other responsive pleading is 10/21/2020.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 11, 2020 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim and for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading by True Wireless, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Daniel)
September 1, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by HTH Communications, LLC, filed.(Holt, Kenneth)
August 25, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by True Wireless, Inc. identifying Surge Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent, filed.(Jackson, Daniel)
August 25, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by True Wireless, Inc., filed.(Jackson, Daniel)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against True Wireless, Inc. by HTH Communications, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holt, Kenneth)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 MOTION for Joshua J. Orewiler to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Jeanah Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Jeanah Park to Appear Pro Hac Vice by True Wireless, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2020. (Jackson, Daniel)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Joshua J. Orewiler to Appear Pro Hac Vice by True Wireless, Inc., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/1/2020. (Jackson, Daniel)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/28/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 8B before Judge Charles Eskridge. (Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalezadi, 4)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 RETURN of Service, filed.(Jackson, Daniel)
July 31, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to HTH Communications, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
July 30, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to HTH Communications, LLC, filed.(Jackson, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Summons Not Issued as to HTH Communications, LLC due to these deficiencies: Name/Address of Plaintiff Attorney or Plaintiff not present. Attorney or Plaintiff notified of deficiencies by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
July 29, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to HTH Communications, LLC, filed.(Jackson, Daniel)
July 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HTH Communications, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24992817) filed by True Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Jackson, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: True Wireless, Inc. v. HTH Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTH Communications, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Hugh Holt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: True Wireless, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel W Jackson
Represented By: Joshua Jason Orewiler
Represented By: Jeanah Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?