Bradford v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Radley Bradford
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02669
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Nancy F Atlas
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CONDITIONAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Case terminated on 9/22/2020 (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 PROPOSED ORDER re: #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Due to Pending Settlement, filed.(Frontino, Brian)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint Due to Pending Settlement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Frontino, Brian)
August 26, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Frontino, Brian)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; Answer due for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. 9/21/2020.(Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(sashabranner, 4)
August 26, 2020 Filing 9 PROPOSED ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion of Defendant JPMorgan Bank, N.A. for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint re: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, filed.(Frontino, Brian)
August 26, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Frontino, Brian)
August 14, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Radley Bradford, filed.(Badwan, Mohammed)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 8/10/2020, answer due 8/31/2020, filed.(Badwan, Mohammed)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
August 4, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Badwan, Mohammed)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9F before Judge Nancy F Atlas. (Signed by Judge Nancy F Atlas) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mohammed O. Badwan on behalf of Radley Bradford, filed. (Badwan, Mohammed)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24994835) filed by Radley Bradford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Badwan, Mohammed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradford v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Brian Charles Frontino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Radley Bradford
Represented By: Mohammed Omar Badwan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?