Enerflex Energy Systems Inc. et al v. Unknown Registrant et al
Plaintiff: Enerflex, Ltd. and Enerflex Energy Systems Inc.
Defendant: Choopa, LLC, Unknown Registrant a/k/a Ryan Garvey, Unknown Registrant and Ryan Garvey
Case Number: 4:2020cv02696
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: George C Hanks
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison) Parties notified.(agould, 3)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 Summons Issued as to Unknown Registrant. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Unknown Registrant, filed.(Barr, John)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Notice of Dismissal. Choopa, LLC is dismissed without prejudice. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(gclair, 4)
August 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Dismissal as to Choopa, LLC by Enerflex Energy Systems Inc., Enerflex, Ltd., filed. (Barr, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 Return of Service Unexecuted as to Unknown Registrant re: Original Complaint and Expedited Ex-Parte Application for Entry of Preliminary and Permanent Injunctive Relief, filed.(Barr, John)
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brooks D. Tueting on behalf of Enerflex Energy Systems Inc., Enerflex, Ltd., filed. (Tueting, Brooks)
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Choopa, LLC served on 8/4/2020, answer due 8/25/2020, filed.(Barr, John)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Enerflex Energy Systems Inc., Enerflex, Ltd., filed.(Barr, John)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John A. Yates on behalf of Enerflex Energy Systems Inc., Enerflex, Ltd., filed. (Yates, John)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ShadiaNashadi, 4)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/12/2020 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 600 in Houston before Magistrate Judge Andrew M Edison. (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Choopa, LLC, Unknown Registrant a/k/a Ryan Garvey. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons #2 R.G)(JacquelineMata, 4)
July 31, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Unknown Registrant a/k/a Ryan Garvey, filed.(Barr, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Choopa, LLC, filed.(Barr, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND EXPEDITED EX-PARTE APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY AND PERMANENT INJUCTIVE RELIEF against Choopa, LLC, Unknown Registrant a/k/a Ryan Garvey (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25003917) filed by Enerflex Energy Systems Inc., Enerflex, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Order (Preliminary Injunction))(Barr, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Enerflex Energy Systems Inc. et al v. Unknown Registrant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choopa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Registrant a/k/a Ryan Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Registrant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enerflex, Ltd.
Represented By: John Hanson Barr, Jr
Represented By: Brooks David Tueting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enerflex Energy Systems Inc.
Represented By: John Allen Yates
Represented By: John Hanson Barr, Jr
Represented By: Brooks David Tueting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?