The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association v. Carroll
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association fka The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, In, The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association and The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A.
Defendant: Sherrie R Carroll
Case Number: 4:2020cv02732
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2020 Initial Conference set for October 8, 2020 is terminated. (ealexander, 4)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Abate.(Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(ealexander, 4)
September 28, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 10:30 AM by video before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray, filed. (jmarchand, 4)
September 28, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Abate by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hessami, Samin)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Letter from Defendant re: Mortgage, filed. (mmapps, 4)
August 25, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Sherrie R Carroll served on 8/17/2020, answer due 9/8/2020, filed.(Hessami, Samin)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(DawnWaggoneradi, 4)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sherrie R Carroll. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Sherrie R Carroll, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association fka The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, In, filed.(Cronenwett, Mark)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sherrie R Carroll (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25019027) filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association fka The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, In. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cronenwett, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association v. Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association fka The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A. as successor to JPMorgan Chase Bank, as Trustee for Residential Asset Mortgage Products, In
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, National Association
Represented By: Samin Hessami
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bank of New York Trust Company, N.A.
Represented By: Samin Hessami
Represented By: Mark Douglas Cronenwett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherrie R Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?