McDonald v. Smith Excavation & Hauling et al
Plaintiff: Sheila McDonald
Defendant: Smith Excavation, Angela Smith, Smith Excavation & Hauling and Dennis Ray Smith, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02820
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Angela Smith, Smith Excavation, Dennis Ray Smith, Jr., filed.(Lanza, Nicholas)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Angela Smith, Smith Excavation, Dennis Ray Smith, Jr., filed.(Lanza, Nicholas)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Angela Smith, Smith Excavation, Dennis Ray Smith, Jr., filed.(Lanza, Nicholas)
August 19, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sheila McDonald, filed.(Mitchell, Joe)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(ShadiaNash, 4)
August 13, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons-Smith Excavation, #2 Summons-Dennis Ray Smith, Jr., #3 Summons-Angela Smith)(Mitchell, Joe)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25056400) filed by Sheila McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mitchell, Joe)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDonald v. Smith Excavation & Hauling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Excavation
Represented By: Nicholas J Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Smith
Represented By: Nicholas J Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Excavation & Hauling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Ray Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas J Lanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila McDonald
Represented By: Joe K Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?