Phillips v. Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Phillips
Defendant: IAT Insurance Group, Inc. and Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina
Case Number: 4:2020cv02826
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: David Hittner
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Filing 5 First AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by IAT Insurance Group, Inc., Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, filed. (Thompson, Rhonda)
August 28, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by IAT Insurance Group, Inc., Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina, filed.(Usery, Susan)
August 28, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Jeffrey Phillips, filed.(Peel, Clifford)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd Judicial District Court of Harris County, Texas, case number 2020-39676 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25058681) filed by Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Thompson, Rhonda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IAT Insurance Group, Inc.
Represented By: Rhonda J Thompson
Represented By: Susan Sparks Usery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Occidental Fire & Casualty Company of North Carolina
Represented By: Rhonda J Thompson
Represented By: Susan Sparks Usery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Phillips
Represented By: Clifford DeWitt Peel, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?