Okwesilieze Women's Club of Nigeria International and Gboliwe Grace Chukwu v. De Okwesilieze International Women' Club, Ijeoma Opara
Plaintiff: OKWESILIEZE WOMEN'S CLUB OF NIGERIA INTERNATIONAL AND GBOLIWE GRACE CHUKWU, Gboliwe Chukwu and Okwesilieze Women's Club of Nigeria International
Defendant: DE OKWESILIEZE INTERNATIONAL WOMEN' CLUB, IJEOMA OPARA, De Okwesilieze International Women's Club and Ijeoma Opara
Case Number: 4:2020cv02845
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lee H Rosenthal
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Initial Conference reset for 11/6/2020 at 11:00 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal, filed. Additional time was needed for the motion responses to be filed. A Zoom link will be emailed for participation. (leddins, 4)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Gboliwe Chukwu, filed.(Smith, Thomas)
September 29, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by De Okwesilieze International Women's Club, filed.(Okorafor, James)
September 28, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss DEFENDANT, IJEOMA OPARAS, MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 21 by Ijeoma Opara, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Okorafor, James)
September 25, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Gboliwe Chukwu, filed.(Smith, Thomas)
August 22, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Gboliwe Chukwu, Okwesilieze Women's Club of Nigeria International, filed.(Smith, Thomas)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 10/9/2020 at 10:45 AM iby video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Judge's Procedures) Parties notified.(leddins, 4)
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by De Okwesilieze International Women's Club, filed. (Okorafor, James)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 US Patent and Trademark Office Notified. AO 120, filed. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ChristopherSarratadi, 4)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 281st, case number 2020-40705 () filed by DE OKWESILIEZE INTERNATIONAL WOMEN' CLUB, IJEOMA OPARA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Okorafor, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Okwesilieze Women's Club of Nigeria International and Gboliwe Grace Chukwu v. De Okwesilieze International Women' Club, Ijeoma Opara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DE OKWESILIEZE INTERNATIONAL WOMEN' CLUB, IJEOMA OPARA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: De Okwesilieze International Women's Club
Represented By: James Okoro Okorafor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ijeoma Opara
Represented By: James Okoro Okorafor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OKWESILIEZE WOMEN'S CLUB OF NIGERIA INTERNATIONAL AND GBOLIWE GRACE CHUKWU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gboliwe Chukwu
Represented By: Roger G Jain
Represented By: Thomas H Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Okwesilieze Women's Club of Nigeria International
Represented By: Roger G Jain
Represented By: Thomas H Smith, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?