Moreau v. Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Leah Moreau
Defendant: Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC. and Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC.
Case Number: 4:2020cv02893
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. (Response due by 10/20/2020 re: #10 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire). (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Leah Moreau, filed. Motion Docket Date 11/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schreiber, Richard)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension to Respond to Defendants Motion to Transfer Venue. (Response due by 10/13/2020 re: #10 Motion to Transfer Venue.) (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4)
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue by Leah Moreau, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Schreiber, Richard)
September 28, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC., Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC., filed.(Rivas-Molloy, Claudia)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Kenneth W. Gage to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC., Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 21, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Kenneth W. Gage to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC., Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NY Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit SDNY Certificate of Service)(Rivas-Molloy, Claudia)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for John-Mark Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #11 Motion for James P. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 15, 2020 Filing 13 Corrected MOTION for John-Mark Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC., Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rivas-Molloy, Claudia)
September 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for John-Mark Turner to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC., Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rivas-Molloy, Claudia)
September 15, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for James P. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC., Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rivas-Molloy, Claudia)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire by Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC., Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Appendix Cited Authorities, #4 Proposed Order)(Rivas-Molloy, Claudia)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC. served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020, filed.(Schreiber, Richard)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Leah Moreau, filed.(Schreiber, Richard)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard J. (Rex) Burch on behalf of Leah Moreau, filed. (Burch, Richard)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 12/11/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(ShadiaNashadi, 4)
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(ChristopherSarrat, 4)
August 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard M. Schreiber on behalf of Leah Moreau, filed. (Schreiber, Richard)
August 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W. Dunlap on behalf of Leah Moreau, filed. (Dunlap, Andrew)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC., Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC., filed. (Attachments: #1 Continuation)(Josephson, Michael)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC., Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25076539) filed by Leah Moreau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreau v. Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicus Healthcare Solutions, LLC.
Represented By: Claudia Veronica Rivas-Molloy
Represented By: Kenneth W. Gage
Represented By: James P Harris
Represented By: John Mark Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medicus Hospitalist Services, LLC.
Represented By: Claudia Veronica Rivas-Molloy
Represented By: Kenneth W. Gage
Represented By: James P Harris
Represented By: John Mark Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Moreau
Represented By: Andrew Wells Dunlap
Represented By: Richard Mark Schreiber
Represented By: Michael A Josephson
Represented By: Richard J Burch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?