Peavy v. Navasota Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Jimmie Lee Peavy, Jr
Defendant: City of Navasota, Navasota Police Department, Grimes County and State Of Texas
Case Number: 4:2020cv02926
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth M Hoyt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Collection and Payment of Full Filing Fee as to Jimmy Lee Peavy, Jr.; Granting #4 MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Jimmie Lee Peavy, Jr., filed. Motion Docket Date 9/21/2020. (MarcelleLaBee, 4)
August 23, 2020 Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Jimmie Lee Peavy, Jr. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 9/22/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (ShadiaNash, 4)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Jimmy Lee Peavy, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope)(ShadiaNash, 4)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peavy v. Navasota Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Navasota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navasota Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grimes County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Texas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmie Lee Peavy, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?