Frazier v. U.S. Bank, N.A.,
Plaintiff: James Frazier
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., Not in Its Individual Capacity but solely as Trustee for The RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT and U.S. Bank, N.A.,
Case Number: 4:2020cv02960
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Lynn N Hughes
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Filing 5 Final DISMISSAL. On the stipulation of the parties, this case is dismissed without prejudice #4 . Case terminated on 9/15/2020. (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (ghassan, 4)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff James Frazier and by U.S. Bank, N.A.,, filed. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Gibson, Crystal)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order: Initial Conference set for 9/23/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11C before Judge Lynn N Hughes.(Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified. (sanderson, 4)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE in a Removed or Transferred Case (Signed by Judge Lynn N Hughes) Parties notified.(JacquelineMataadi, 4)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 240th District of Fort Bend Co., case number 19-DCV-259325 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25104323) filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., Not in Its Individual Capacity but solely as Trustee for The RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Index of the Matters, #2 Exhibit 2- State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit 3-List of All Counsel, #4 Exhibit 4-Notice of removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6-Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Int Parties, #7 Exhibit 7-Fort Bend CAD)(Gibson, Crystal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. U.S. Bank, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Frazier
Represented By: Erick Joseph DeLaRue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A., Not in Its Individual Capacity but solely as Trustee for The RMAC Trust, Series 2016-CTT
Represented By: Crystal G Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.,
Represented By: Crystal G Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?