Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church et al v. Paxton et al
Plaintiff: Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church and Perk You Later, LLC
Defendant: Chief of Houston PD Art Acevedo, County Attorney Vince Ryan, Presiding Officer Kim Lemaux, Harris County DA Kim Ogg, Webster Acting Chief Pete Bacon, TX Attorney General Ken Paxton and County Sheriff Ed Gonzalez
Case Number: 4:2020cv03081
Filed: September 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Vanessa D Gilmore
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Peter C Canfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Charlotte Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4)
September 10, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Peter C. Canfield to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2020. (hlerma, 4)
September 10, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Charlotte H. Taylor to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/1/2020. (hlerma, 4)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #10 Motion for Stephen J. Petrany to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #8 Motion for Alla Lefkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jguajardo, 4)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Stephen J. Petrany to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Perk You Later, LLC. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Nigar Aftab Shaikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Perk You Later, LLC. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Alla Lefkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Perk You Later, LLC. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(sanderson, 4)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Nigar Aftab Shaikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/24/2020. (hlerma, 4)
September 2, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Stephen J. Petrany to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (hlerma, 4)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Alla Lefkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (hlerma, 4)
September 2, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Stephen J. Petrany to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Perk You Later, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (Taylor, William)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Nigar Aftab Shaikh to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Perk You Later, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (Taylor, William)
September 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Alla Lefkowitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Perk You Later, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/23/2020. (Taylor, William)
September 2, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Perk You Later, LLC, filed.(Taylor, William)
September 2, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, filed.(Taylor, William)
September 2, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church, filed.(Taylor, William)
September 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25151526) filed by Perk You Later, LLC, Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee, Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Taylor, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church et al v. Paxton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief of Houston PD Art Acevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Attorney Vince Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presiding Officer Kim Lemaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harris County DA Kim Ogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster Acting Chief Pete Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TX Attorney General Ken Paxton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Sheriff Ed Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drink Houston Better, LLC d/b/a Antidote Coffee
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bay Area Unitarian Universalist Church
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perk You Later, LLC
Represented By: William Roquemore Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?