Hammad v. Hammad
Plaintiff: Magdoline S Hammad
Defendant: Ramsey Hammad
Case Number: 4:2020cv03142
Filed: September 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Texas
Presiding Judge: Charles Eskridge
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 2511
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 MOTION to Dismiss. The claims against Defendant Ramsey Hammad are dismissed without prejudice. If Plaintiff Magdoline S Hammad refiles this action she must designate the new action as a related case to the instant action for assignment to this Court. Case terminated on 09/28/2020.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 25, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss #3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #8 First AMENDED MOTIONAmended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Magdoline S Hammad, filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2020. (Rucker, Hamilton)
September 25, 2020 Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 at 02:30 PM in by video before Judge Charles Eskridge is canceled. (jengonzalez, 4)
September 24, 2020 Filing 13 Exhibit List by Ramsey Hammad(LaGrappe, John)
September 24, 2020 Filing 12 Witness List by Ramsey Hammad(LaGrappe, John)
September 23, 2020 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER re: #10 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed.(LaGrappe, John)
September 18, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition to #8 First AMENDED MOTIONAmended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Ramsey Hammad. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Letter, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(LaGrappe, John)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #8 Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Court reserves decision on whether to grant a preliminary injunction until consideration at hearing. The parties and their counsel are ordered to appear for an in-person hearing on 09/25/2020 at 2:30 pm.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 First AMENDED MOTION, Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction( Motion Docket Date 10/6/2020.) by Magdoline S Hammad, filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Affidavit)(Rucker, Hamilton)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: Defendant Ramsey Hammad must file his response by 09/18/2020. Plaintiff Magdoline S Hammad must file her reply, if any, by 09/23/2020. Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 at 02:30 PM in by video before Judge Charles Eskridge(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Ramsey Hammad served on 9/10/2020, answer due 10/1/2020, filed.(Rucker, Hamilton)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #3 Motion for temporary restraining order. The Court reserves decision on whether to grant a preliminary injunction until a later time. The Court directs Plaintiff to follow this Court's procedures with respect to emergency motions. The Court intends to immediately set a compressed briefing schedule and prompt hearing on the motion for preliminary injunction upon service of Defendant.(Signed by Judge Charles Eskridge) Parties notified.(jengonzalez, 4)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Ramsey Hammad. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(ShadiaNash, 4)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Magdoline S Hammad, filed. Motion Docket Date 9/30/2020. (Rucker, Hamilton)
September 9, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Issuance of Summons as to Ramsey Hammad, filed.(Rucker, Hamilton)
September 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-25179098) filed by Magdoline S Hammad.(Rucker, Hamilton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Texas Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hammad v. Hammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magdoline S Hammad
Represented By: Hamilton George Rucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramsey Hammad
Represented By: John Charles LaGrappe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?